MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. v. Cellmark Paper Inc.
Plaintiff: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Defendant: Cellmark Paper Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03736
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. re #11 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Marissen, James) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. Cellmark Paper Inc. served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Marissen, James) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/19/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 6/12/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A... (Marissen, James) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cellmark Paper Inc. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/19/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. (Marissen, James) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. (Marissen, James) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Marissen, James) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cellmark Paper Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14545984.). Filed byMSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marissen, James) (Filed on 6/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. v. Cellmark Paper Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Represented By: James Arthur Henry Marissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellmark Paper Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?