Water Sports Kauai, Inc. v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Water Sports Kauai, Inc., Water Sports Kauai, Inc. doing business as Sand People and Water Sports Kauai, Inc. a Hawaii corporation, dba Sand People, on behalf itself and all others similarly situated doing business as Sand People
Defendant: National Surety Corporation, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co. and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03750
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 26 Refund Status re #24 Application for Refund, #25 Application for Refund, #23 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 25 Application for Refund, Receipt Number Receipt 0971-14547964 Refund for Duplicate Charge #3 by Water Sports Kauai, Inc.. (Polin, Jacob) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 Application for Refund, Receipt Number Receipt 0971-14547964 Refund for Duplicate Charge #2 by Water Sports Kauai, Inc.. (Polin, Jacob) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 23 Application for Refund, Receipt Number Receipt 0971-14547913 Duplicate Charge on Complaint by Water Sports Kauai, Inc.. (Polin, Jacob) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Phillips (Phillips, John) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Surety Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, Corporate Parent AGCS International Holdings BV for National Surety Corporation. (Sperla, Gregory) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Surety Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, Corporate Parent AGCS International Holdings BV for National Surety Corporation. (Sperla, Gregory) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, Corporate Parent AGCS International Holdings BV, Other Affiliate National Surety Corporation for Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Sperla, Gregory) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, Corporate Parent AGCS International Holdings BV, Other Affiliate National Surety Corporation for Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Sperla, Gregory) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, Corporate Parent AGCS International Holdings BV, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate National Surety Corporation for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co.. (Sperla, Gregory) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, Corporate Parent AGCS International Holdings BV, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate National Surety Corporation for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co.. (Sperla, Gregory) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Respond filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co., Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation. (Sperla, Gregory) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Water Sports Kauai, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Polin, Jacob) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 13, 2020 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/13/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2020)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 6/12/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Water Sports Kauai, Inc... (Nelson, Robert) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to National Surety Corporation. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co.. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Nelson, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Nelson, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Nelson, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/22/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Fee paid, Recept number 0971-14547816) against Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co., Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation. Filed byWater Sports Kauai, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Robert) (Filed on 6/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Water Sports Kauai, Inc. v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Surety Corporation
Represented By: John Paul Phillips
Represented By: Gregory George Sperla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co.
Represented By: John Paul Phillips
Represented By: Gregory George Sperla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: John Paul Phillips
Represented By: Gregory George Sperla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water Sports Kauai, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Jay Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water Sports Kauai, Inc. doing business as Sand People
Represented By: Robert Jay Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water Sports Kauai, Inc. a Hawaii corporation, dba Sand People, on behalf itself and all others similarly situated doing business as Sand People
Represented By: Robert Jay Nelson
Represented By: Jacob Henry Polin
Represented By: Fabrice Nijhof Vincent
Represented By: Alexandra Louise Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?