Hurricane Electric LLC v. Dallas Buyers Club, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hurricane Electric LLC
Defendant: Dallas Buyers Club (TX LLC), Killing Link Distribution, LLC, TBV Productions, LLC, Craig J. Flores, Voltage Productions, Inc., Survivor Productions, Inc., Dallas Buyers Club (CA LLC), Millenium Entertainment, LLC, Double Life Porductions, Inc., Avi Lerner, WWE Studios Finance Corp., I Am Wrath Production, Inc., Cell Film Holdings, LLC, Mon, LLC, Voltage Pictures, LLC, Glacier Films 1, LLC, Cook Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Nicolas Chartier, Pow Nevada, LLC, Orion Releasing, LLC, Headhunter, LLC and Dallas Buyers Club, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv03813
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Solely as to Defendants, Orion Releasing LLC (CA Limited Liability Company) and Survivor Productions, Inc. (CA Corporation) by Hurricane Electric LLC (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 8/8/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FIRST STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND CERTAIN DEFENDANTS TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, TO REQUEST AN EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Cell Film Holdings, LLC, Nicolas Chartier, Cook Productions, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(a California LLC), Double Life Porductions, Inc., Craig J. Flores, Glacier Films 1, LLC, Headhunter, LLC, I Am Wrath Production, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Avi Lerner, Mon, LLC, Pow Nevada, LLC, TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Voltage Pictures, LLC, Voltage Productions, Inc., WWE Studios Finance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attestation)(Culpepper, Kerry) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by Hurricane Electric LLC Of Pendency of Other Action in D. Nevada [L.R. 3-13] (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 24 FIRST CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED ENTITIES AND PERSONS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-15 filed by Craig J. Flores (Culpepper, Kerry) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Steven Culpepper ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CRAIG J. FLORES (Culpepper, Kerry) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hurricane Electric LLC. Service waived by Craig J. Flores waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hurricane Electric LLC. Service waived by Avi Lerner waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 20 Certification as to Interested Entities and Persons Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 filed by Cell Film Holdings, LLC, Nicolas Chartier, Cook Productions, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(a California LLC), Double Life Porductions, Inc., Glacier Films 1, LLC, Headhunter, LLC, I Am Wrath Production, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Avi Lerner, Mon, LLC, Pow Nevada, LLC, Survivor Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Voltage Pictures, LLC, Voltage Productions, Inc., WWE Studios Finance Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Cinetel Films, Inc. for Killing Link Distribution, LLC; Other Affiliate Glacier Films (USA) for Glacier Films 1, LLC; Other Affiliate Voltage Pictures, Other Affiliate Soundford Limited for Mon, LLC; Other Affiliate Hannibal Media, Inc. for I Am Wrath Production, Inc.; Other Affiliate BD&P Company LLC for Cell Film Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent Nu Image, Inc. for Double Life Porductions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for Survivor Productions, Inc.; Other Affiliate Voltage Pictures for Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, WWE Studios Finance Corp.; Corporate Parent Voltage Holdings, LLC for Headhunter, LLC, Pow Nevada, LLC; Other Affiliate Voltage Productions, LLC for TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Kerry S. Culpepper. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Kerry S. Culpepper, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14697291) filed by Cell Film Holdings, LLC, Nicolas Chartier, Cook Productions, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(a California LLC), Double Life Porductions, Inc., Glacier Films 1, LLC, Headhunter, LLC, I Am Wrath Production, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Avi Lerner, Mon, LLC, Pow Nevada, LLC, Survivor Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Voltage Pictures, LLC, Voltage Productions, Inc., WWE Studios Finance Corp.. (Attachments: #(1) Hawaii Certificate of Good Standing)(Culpepper, Kerry) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hurricane Electric LLC. Service waived by Cook Productions, LLC waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hurricane Electric LLC. Service waived by WWE Studios Finance Corp. waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hurricane Electric LLC. Service waived by Cell Film Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Nicolas Chartier waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(a California LLC) waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Double Life Porductions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Glacier Films 1, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Headhunter, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; I Am Wrath Production, Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Killing Link Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Mon, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Pow Nevada, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Survivor Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; TBV Productions, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Venice PI, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Voltage Pictures, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Voltage Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Roberts (Roberts, John) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 6/12/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Defendants Cell Film Holdings, LLC, Nicolas Chartier, Cook Productions, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (a California LLC), Dallas Buyers Club, LLC (a Texas LLC), Double Life Porductions, Inc., Craig J. Flores, Glacier Films 1, LLC, Headhunter, LLC, I Am Wrath Production, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Avi Lerner, Millenium Entertainment, LLC, Mon, LLC, Orion Releasing, LLC, Pow Nevada, LLC, Survivor Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Voltage Pictures, LLC, Voltage Productions, Inc., WWE Studios Finance Corp.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyrights infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Hurricane Electric LLC. (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint, and have been added to this case: 1-20 DOES. (This is a text-only entry.) (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities and Persons Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 filed by Hurricane Electric LLC (Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Misuse and Declaratory Judgment of No Copyright Infringement; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14563295). Filed byHurricane Electric LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greenstein, Neil) (Filed on 6/10/2020) Modified on 6/11/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurricane Electric LLC v. Dallas Buyers Club, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Buyers Club (TX LLC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Killing Link Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBV Productions, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig J. Flores
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Tobi Carver Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltage Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Survivor Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Buyers Club (CA LLC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millenium Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double Life Porductions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avi Lerner
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WWE Studios Finance Corp.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Am Wrath Production, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cell Film Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mon, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltage Pictures, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glacier Films 1, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Productions, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venice PI, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Chartier
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pow Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Releasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headhunter, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Buyers Club, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hurricane Electric LLC
Represented By: Neil D. Greenstein
Represented By: John L. Roberts
Represented By: Martin R. Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?