New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund
Defendant: Lupin Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Lupin Ltd., Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC and Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv04056
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 8/27/2020. Replies due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit 1 - AFL Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC identifying Other Affiliate TPG Global, LLC, Other Affiliate Fosun International Limited, Other Affiliate Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Nanomi BV for Lupin Inc.. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #43 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 43 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund. Responses due by 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilad Bendheim (Bendheim, Gilad) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay P. Lefkowitz (Lefkowitz, Jay) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Devora Allon (Allon, Devora) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hikma plc, Other Affiliate Hikma Labs Inc., Other Affiliate Hikma USA for Eurohealth (USA), Inc.; Corporate Parent Hikma plc, Other Affiliate Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Other Affiliate Hikma Labs Inc. for Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.; Corporate Parent Hikma plc, Other Affiliate Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Other Affiliate Hikma USA for Roxane Laboratories, Inc.. (Pace, Jack) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Pace.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Mims.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Bendheim.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Allon.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Lefkowitz.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, (Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a)) filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Bradshaw, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 32 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited for Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Defendants Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Jazz Pharmaceuticals plcs Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Andrews, Stephen) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, Stipulation Regarding Defendants Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Jazz Pharmaceuticals plcs Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Andrews, Stephen) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Darren Andrews for Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Jazz Pharmaceuticals plc (Andrews, Stephen) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jack E. Pace ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14710750.) filed by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Heather) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Kathryn J. Mims ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14710637.) filed by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Heather) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Burke (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Shipley for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Lupin Inc. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14696535.) filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bendheim, Gilad) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14696477.) filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Allon, Devora) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14696415.) filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lefkowitz, Jay) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Shipley for Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund. Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund. Lupin Inc. served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund. Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund. Eurohealth (USA), Inc. served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 14 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc. for Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Bradshaw, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Bradshaw, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Monsura A. Sirajee on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Sirajee, Monsura) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Williamson, Brett) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Joel McIntyre on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (McIntyre, Stephen) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14595353.). Filed byNew York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Represented By: Gilad Bendheim
Represented By: Devora Allon
Represented By: Michael John Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxane Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Darren Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurohealth (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Represented By: Gilad Bendheim
Represented By: Devora Allon
Represented By: Michael John Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Kathryn J. Mims
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
Represented By: Stephen Joel McIntyre
Represented By: Brett Johnston Williamson
Represented By: Monsura A. Sirajee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Represented By: Gilad Bendheim
Represented By: Devora Allon
Represented By: Michael John Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Represented By: Stephen Darren Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Represented By: Scott M. Grzenczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?