AuthWallet LLC v. Visa Inc.
Plaintiff: AuthWallet LLC
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04121
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 27 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AuthWallet LLC (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. All pending motions will be taken off calendar and must be renoticed by the moving party for a new hearing date on a Thursday at 08:00 AM. The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the renotice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 73. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7-27-2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Visa Inc... (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE. In accordance with L.R. 6-1(a), Court approval of the parties' stipulation #14 is not required because the change will not alter the date of any event or any deadline already fixed by Court order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Manon L. Burns.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Barry Irwin.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Manon L. Burns ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14695549.) filed by Visa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burns, Manon) (Filed on 7/15/2020) Modified on 7/16/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Barry F. Irwin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14695063.) filed by Visa Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barry, Irwin) (Filed on 7/15/2020) Modified on 7/16/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Augusto Slater (Slater, Michael) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Visa Inc. and Authwallet, LLC. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 7/14/2020) Modified on 7/15/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Visa Inc. (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia L. Peden (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by AuthWallet LLC identifying Other Affiliate Dynamic IP Deals LLC for AuthWallet LLC. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Visa Inc.. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #8 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by AuthWallet LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by AuthWallet LLC (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by AuthWallet LLC (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AuthWallet LLC.. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by AuthWallet LLC Amended. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patents. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Visa Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14608240.). Filed byAuthWallet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). Please complete correct Civil Cover Shee t and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AuthWallet LLC v. Visa Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Represented By: Patricia L. Peden
Represented By: Michael Augusto Slater
Represented By: Irwin F. Barry
Represented By: Manon L Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AuthWallet LLC
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?