Ivone v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ivone
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv04166
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Michigan Eastern, 2:20-cv-11283, Ivone v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-04166-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 215 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-11283. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of California for MDL 2741 (SSch)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-215) to Northern District of California for MDL # 2741. (SSch)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-215) for MDL # 2741. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
May 26, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Monsanto Company* (SKra)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nicholas Ivone against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7818227 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Out of state. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2:20-cv-10522, Judge David M. Lawson] (Doyle, Brion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivone v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ivone
Represented By: Brion B. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?