Keil v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Martha Keil
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv04201
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2741, Northern District of Illinois, 1:20-cv-02448, Keil v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-04201 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 216 cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02448. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California the electronic record. (ph, )
June 22, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL No. 2741 Conditional Transfer Order filed 6/22/2020. (ph, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (ph, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Martha Keil by Rebecca Laine Fredona (Fredona, Rebecca)
April 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Martha Keil; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16946224. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fredona, Rebecca)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keil v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Keil
Represented By: Rebecca Laine Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?