The Center for Investigative Reporting, et al v. U.S. Department of Interior
Plaintiff: The Center for Investigative Reporting and Lance Williams
Defendant: U.S. Department of Interior
Case Number: 3:2020cv04427
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Department of Interior. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of Interior.. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Lance Williams (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/11/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gioconda R. Molinari (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Lance Williams.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Brooke (Brooke, Rachel) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Interior. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/20/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint, and have been added to this case: Lance Williams. (This is a text-only entry.) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against U.S. Department of Interior (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14650591.). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 7/2/2020) Modified on 7/6/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Center for Investigative Reporting, et al v. U.S. Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Center for Investigative Reporting
Represented By: Diana Victoria Baranetsky
Represented By: Rachel M. Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Williams
Represented By: Rachel M. Brooke
Represented By: Diana Victoria Baranetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Interior
Represented By: Gioconda R. Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?