Natrona County School Board v. Juul Labs Inc
Plaintiff: Natrona County School Board
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04503
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED re 19-md-2913-WHO: USDC, District of Wyoming, 2:20-cv-00106-ABJ, Natrona County School Board v. Juul Labs, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3"20-cv-04503-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-34) cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the District of Wyoming (Cheyenne); Case Number 2:20-cv-00106-ABJ. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 6, 2020 Transfering Case to MDL Panel. (Court Staff, szf)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL Panel. CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-34) - 2 action(s) re: pldg. ( 540 in MDL No. 2913, 1 in PAW/2:20-cv-00926, 1 in WY/2:20-cv-00106) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/6/2020.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, PAW/2:20-cv-00926, WY/2:20-cv-00106 (TF) (Court Staff, szf)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 (TEXT-ONLY) MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-34) Finalized on 7/6/20. Please see pleading ( 553 in MDL No. 2913, 3 in PAW/2:20-cv-00926, 3 in WY/2:20-cv-00106).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/6/2020.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, PAW/2:20-cv-00926, WY/2:20-cv-00106 (TF) (Court Staff, szf)
June 29, 2020 Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment. Filing Fee $400 was paid with Receipt Number: CHY033227 (Court Staff, sbh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued (Court Staff, sbh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Natrona County School Board (1 summons issued) Counsel - payment is due within 3 days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2131 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natrona County School Board v. Juul Labs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natrona County School Board
Represented By: Jason Edward Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?