Tumenas v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Lorraine Magdalena Tumenas
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv04520
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Middle District of Florida, 6:20-cv-00860, Tumenas v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-4520-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order #10 cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:20-cv-00860. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741 (MAA)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/28/20. (MT)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lorraine Magdalena Tumenas. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Lorraine Magdalena Tumenas. (Chambers, G.)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/21/2020. (RN)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/3/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/20/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/3/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/20/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (KNC)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-860-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16826205) filed by Lorraine Magdalena Tumenas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tumenas v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Magdalena Tumenas
Represented By: Genevieve Katherine Chambers
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?