French Laundry Partners, LP dba The French Laundry et al v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs The French Laundry, Thomas Keller Restaurant Group and Bouchon Bistro sued Defendants Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Trumbull Insurance Company and Napa County Health Officer Karen Relucio. The question presented is whether the health officer's shelter-in-place order constitutes a prohibition of access to the business premises such that the plaintiff's loss of income is covered by their business income insurance policy issued by the defendant insurer.

Plaintiff: Yountville Food Emporium, LLC d/b/a Bouchon Bistro, KRM, Inc. d/b/a Thomas Keller Restaurant and French Laundry Partners, LP dba The French Laundry
Defendant: Trumbull Insurance Company, Karen Relucio and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv04540
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Trumbull Insurance Company re 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Oh, Johanna) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/23/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Trumbull Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Trumbull Insurance Company. (Oh, Johanna) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Oh, Johanna) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Napa County Superior Court California. Their case number is 20CV000397. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14669467). Filed byHartford Fire Insurance Company, Trumbull Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Johanna Oh, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Civil Cover Sheet, # 17 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Oh, Johanna) (Filed on 7/8/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French Laundry Partners, LP dba The French Laundry et al v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yountville Food Emporium, LLC d/b/a Bouchon Bistro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRM, Inc. d/b/a Thomas Keller Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: French Laundry Partners, LP dba The French Laundry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumbull Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Relucio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?