American Small Business League v. Small Business Administration
Plaintiff: American Small Business League
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv04619
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Small Business League. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2023 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 9/18/2020. Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - AA to Karl Olson Declaration, #3 Declaration of Lloyd Champan, #4 Declaration of Mark Olson, #5 Proposed Order)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Small Business League re #18 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/17/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Small Business Administration.. (Bickford, James) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint bySmall Business Administration. (Bickford, James) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Bickford (Bickford, James) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Small Business League.. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 20, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #11 Notice of Appearance filed by American Small Business League, #10 Notice of Appearance filed by American Small Business League (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Field (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/17/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Irene Lee (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/17/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines ; Civil Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley; ECF Registration Information; and Notice of Assignment of Case and Consent/Decline to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial served on William P. Barr, U.S. Department of Justice on 7/15/2020, filed by American Small Business League. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines ; Civil Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley; ECF Registration Information; and Notice of Assignment of Case and Consent/Decline to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial served on U.S. Small Business Administration on 7/15/2020, filed by American Small Business League. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Small Business League re #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons USDOJ, Summons USAG Barr)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Small Business Administration ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14680125.). Filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/10/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Small Business League v. Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Represented By: James Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Small Business League
Represented By: Karl Olson
Represented By: Aaron Robert Field
Represented By: Irene Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?