Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.103.236.62
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.103.236.62
Case Number: 3:2020cv04710
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #8 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. The provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508 require the submission of a report to the Register of Copyrights. Please e-file a proposed Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright form AO 121 using the event Civil Events Other Filings Notices Notice (Other), within five days of this notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 #Electronic filing error. John Doe is the defendant and should not be entered as "Other Affiliate". Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) Modified on 7/15/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.103.236.62 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14692362.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.103.236.62
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.103.236.62
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?