City of Grand Rapids General Retirement System et al v. Bayer Aktiengesellschaft et al
Plaintiff: City of Grand Rapids Police & Fire Retirement System and City of Grand Rapids General Retirement System
Defendant: Wolfgang Nickl, Johannes Dietsch, Werner Baumann, Liam Condon, Werner Wenning and Bayer Aktiengesellschaft
Case Number: 3:2020cv04737
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/10/2020. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Case Management Conference previously set for October 15, 2020 is continued to April 15, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by April 8, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #8 scheduling order. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Scheduling filed by City of Grand Rapids General Retirement System, City of Grand Rapids Police & Fire Retirement System. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by City of Grand Rapids General Retirement System, City of Grand Rapids Police & Fire Retirement System of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Werner Baumann, Bayer Aktiengesellschaft, Liam Condon, Johannes Dietsch, Wolfgang Nickl, Werner Wenning. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by City of Grand Rapids General Retirement System, City of Grand Rapids Police & Fire Retirement System (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against Werner Baumann, Bayer Aktiengesellschaft, Liam Condon, Johannes Dietsch, Wolfgang Nickl, Werner Wenning ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14697193.). Filed byCity of Grand Rapids General Retirement System, City of Grand Rapids Police & Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/15/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Grand Rapids General Retirement System et al v. Bayer Aktiengesellschaft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Grand Rapids Police & Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Grand Rapids General Retirement System
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolfgang Nickl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johannes Dietsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liam Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Wenning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?