Dobner v. StubHub, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nina Dobner
Defendant: StubHub, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04786
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/4/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Stipulation For Extension of Time to Respond.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #3 Complaint Extension of Time to Respond filed by StubHub, Inc.. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by StubHub, Inc... (Donovan, William) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by StubHub, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Pugnacious Endeavors, Inc., Other Affiliate PUG LLC for StubHub, Inc.. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by StubHub, Inc. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Patrick Donovan, Jr (Donovan, William) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Refund Status re #5 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nina Dobner.. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to StubHub, Inc.. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14705412 by Nina Dobner. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against StubHub, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14705412.). Filed by Nina Dobner. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 7/17/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Missing COMPLAINT Document not properly linked. [err102] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Nina Dobner (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14702494). Filed by Nina Dobner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Safier, Seth) (Filed on 7/16/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobner v. StubHub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Dobner
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Anthony J Patek
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: StubHub, Inc.
Represented By: William Patrick Donovan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?