Brown v. Pickett
Petitioner: Travell Jamal Brown
Respondent: Acting Warden Jason Pickett
Case Number: 3:2020cv04793
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: PSLC JNE
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Sent to TRAVELL JAMAL BROWN Returned as Undeliverable re #7 Order Reassigning Case. Mail Returned; response required by 10/30/2020. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Sent to TRAVELL JAMAL BROWN Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignmenet. Mail Returned; response required by 10/30/2020. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 8/17/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Travell Jamal Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Travell Jamal Brown, CDCR # BD6774.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Travell Jamal Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Warden Jason Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travell Jamal Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?