Lim v. Saul
Plaintiff: Melissa Frances Lim
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv04821
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. This is an erroneous entry. Summons have already been issued and acknowledgment of service received. Re: #7 Proposed Summons filed by Melissa F rances Lim. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Proposed Summons. (Forslund, Jacqueline) (Filed on 9/10/2020) Modified on 9/11/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set as control date for 2/4/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 27, 2020 Electronic receipt of acknowledgment of service by e-mail. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Summons and waiver emailed to SSA. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 <#Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). Please complete correct Civil Cover Sheet and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings < Other Documents < Civil Cover Sheet. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Melissa Frances Lim. (Forslund, Jacqueline) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byMelissa Frances Lim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forslund, Jacqueline) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lim v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Frances Lim
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?