Arjon v. Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carlos Arjon
Defendant: Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04822
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Scheduling Conference held on 9/8/2020. Settlement Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM. Neither party having appeared at the Scheduling Conference throughout the duration of the calendar, the court selected a date. Zoom instructions will be provided separately. Parties are reminded to review Judge Illman's Settlement Conference Standing Order and Zoom guidance on the court's website. FTR Time: 10:09-10:10. Plaintiff Attorney: No Appearance. Defendant Attorney: No Appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/8/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties shall appear by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782 and should be prepared to select a settlement conference date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for a Settlement Conference to occur within 120 days. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/22/2020. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT re ADR and Request for Order by Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roland P. Reynolds, #2 Proposed Order)(Reynolds, Roland) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/20/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 GENERAL ORDER FOR PENDING CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE CHHABRIA. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/30/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 25, 2020 Filing 11 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2020 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPacific Coast Petroleum, Inc.. (Reynolds, Roland) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Answer to Removal Complaint by Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc... (Reynolds, Roland) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc. First Updated (Reynolds, Roland) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc. Amended. (Reynolds, Roland) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 OLD CIVIL COVER SHEET#Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). Please complete cor rect Civil Cover Sheet and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Daniel Arjon for Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc.. (Reynolds, Roland) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19022859. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14707904). Filed byPacific Coast Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration In Support of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil CoverSheet)(Reynolds, Roland) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arjon v. Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Coast Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Roland Paul Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Arjon
Represented By: Fletcher Bernard Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?