State of California et al v. Wheeler et al
Plaintiff: state of north carolina, state of minnesota, state of maryland, state of washington, state of new mexico, state of vermont, state of nevada, state of oregon, commonwealth of virginia, state of colorado, state of illinois, commonwealth of massachusetts, State of wisconsin, district of columbia, state of michigan, state of rhode island, state of connecticut, state of maine, state of new york, state of new jersey and state of california
Defendant: andrew r. wheeler and united states environmental protection agency
Intervenor: Montana, State of, Arkansas, State of, National Hydropower Association, West Virginia, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Texas, State of, Louisiana, State of and Wyoming, State of
Intervenor Defendant: State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Montana, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of Wyoming, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America, State of Arkansas, State of Mississippi and American Petroleum Institute
Case Number: 3:2020cv04869
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 103 Statement of Non-Opposition re #75 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2) and (b)(1), #84 MOTION to Intervene filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #75 , #84 ) (Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARINGS. The Motion Hearings re #75 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2) and (b)(1) and #84 MOTION to Intervene are continued to 11/4/2020 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING #53 MOTION TO INTERVENE BY THE STATES OF LOUISIANA, MONTANA, ARKANSAS, MISSISSIPPI, MISSOURI, TEXAS, WEST VIRGINIA, AND WYOMING. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 100 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #53 MOTION to Intervene ) PLAINTIFF STATES STATEMENT OF NONOPPOSITION TO PROPOSED INTERVENOR DEFENDANT STATES MOTION TO INTERVENE filed byState of California. (Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Turner Smith; granting #98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Ireland. (Attachments: #1 Order re Ireland PHV)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14919552.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/09/2020 filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ireland, Matthew) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14919881.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/09/2020 filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Turner) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Hydropower Association identifying Corporate Parent National Hydropower Association for National Hydropower Association. (Andrews, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #93 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Ireland; denying #94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Turner Smith. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14919881.) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Turner) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14919552.) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ireland, Matthew) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #88 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Charles Sensiba; granting #89 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Wortzel; granting #90 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Misha Tseytlin; granting #91 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Sean Dutton. (Attachments: #1 Order re Wortzel PHV, #2 Order re Tseytlin PHV, #3 Order re Dutton PHV)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Corrected) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905295.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/04/2020 filed by National Hydropower Association. (Dutton, Sean) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Corrected) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905285.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/04/2020 filed by National Hydropower Association. (Tseytlin, Misha) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Corrected) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905263.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/04/2020 filed by National Hydropower Association. (Wortzel, Andrea) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Corrected) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905211.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/04/2020 filed by National Hydropower Association. (Sensiba, Charles) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by George P. Sibley III; granting #82 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Deidre G. Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Order re Duncan PHV)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Charles R. Sensiba; denying #77 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Misha Tseytlin; denying #78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Misha Tseytlin; denying #79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Sean Dutton. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Joseph St. John; granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Murrill; granting #74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Seidemann. (Attachments: #1 Order re Murrill PHV, #2 Order re Seidemann PHV)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION to Intervene filed by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 9/18/2020. Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin Rorick, #2 Declaration of Joan Dreskin, #3 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America identifying Other Affiliate American Petroleum Institute for American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Deidre G. Duncan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14906537.) filed by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice George P. Sibley III ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14906523.) filed by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Marguerite Clare Ellis on Behalf of Intervenors the American Petroleum Institute and the Interstate Natural Gas Association of America (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Sean Dutton) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905295.) filed by National Hydropower Association. (Andrews, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Misha Tseytlin) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905285.) filed by National Hydropower Association. (Andrews, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrea W. Wortzel) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905263.) filed by National Hydropower Association. (Andrews, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Charles R. Sensiba) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905211.) filed by National Hydropower Association. (Andrews, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2) and (b)(1) filed by National Hydropower Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 9/18/2020. Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis Cakert in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Supplement Proposed Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Andrews, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #57 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14881161.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/31/20 filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seidemann, Ryan) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #56 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14881071.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/31/20 filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murrill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #55 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14880960.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/31/20 filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(St. John, Joseph) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting (50) Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Kristi Haskins Johnson in case 3:20-cv-04636-WHA; granting (70) Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Kristi Haskins Johnson in case 3:20-cv-04869-WHA. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2020: #1 Order) (amd2S, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14898939.) filed by Mississippi, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Kristi) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by James C. Kaste. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING MOTION HEARING AND SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. The Motion Hearing as to #53 MOTION to Intervene set for 10/15/2020 is advanced to 10/8/2020 at 8:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)1(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) Modified on 9/3/2020 (amd2S, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2020 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING ON REASSIGNMENT. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 is continued to 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020).
September 3, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14896744.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/03/20 filed by Wyoming, State of. (Kaste, James) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by James C. Kaste. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 63 Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14896744.) filed by State of Wyoming. (Kaste, James) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER RELATING CASE TO NO. C 20-04636 WHA. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/2/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 60 Refund Status re #49 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 59 Statement re #42 Order, Re: Motion to Relate, Case No. 3:20-cv-04636-WHA by State of California, State of Washington, Andrew R. Wheeler, United States Environmental Protection Agency, State of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Wisconsin, District of Columbia, . (Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jill Lacedonia.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ryan Seidemann ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14881161.) filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seidemann, Ryan) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Murrill ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14881071.) filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murrill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Scott St. John ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14880960.) filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(St. John, Joseph) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2020 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/8/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Arkansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 9/11/2020. Replies due by 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. St. John, #2 Exhibit No. 1, #3 Exhibit No. 2, #4 Exhibit No. 3, #5 Exhibit No. 4, #6 Exhibit No. 7, #7 Exhibit No. 8, #8 Exhibit No. 9, #9 Exhibit No. 10, #10 (Proposed) Answer, #11 Proposed Order)(Hacker, David) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jonathan Hacker for State Intervenor-Defendants (Hacker, David) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley A. Benbrook Proposed Intervenors State of Louisiana, State of Arkansas, et al. (Benbrook, Bradley) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2020 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Filing 49 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14809355 Duplicate Charge by State of North Carolina. (Crabtree, Taylor) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 48 Refund Status re #46 Application for Refund, #47 Application for Refund Declined. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 47 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14764692 by State of Wisconsin. (Johnson-Karp, Gabe) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 46 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14764692 by State of Wisconsin. (Johnson-Karp, Gabe) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14839986.) filed by State of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Certificate)(Lacedonia, Jill) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie M. Hill (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 43 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE MOTION TO RELATE in 20-cv-04636-WHA. Parties to file statements by 9/1/20 addressing whether this case should be reassigned pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/18/2020. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Heidi P Stern.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Taylor H Crabtree.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 39 Refund Status re #36 Application for Refund Declined. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14813101.) filed by State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Stern, Heidi) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Jo Morelli (Morelli, Lisa) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 36 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14809361 Duplicate charge. by State of North Carolina. (Crabtree, Taylor) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 35 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Taylor H. Crabtree ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14809361.) filed by State of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Crabtree, Taylor) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Laura B. Murphy.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Brian Lusignan.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Brian R. Caldwell.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Alison B Hoffman.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by David Grandis.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:20-cv-04869-KAW. #Electronic filing error. R e: #27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14783202.) filed by State of Rhode Island, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of Michigan, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Maine, State of Wisconsin, State of California, State of New Mexico, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, State of Colorado (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14784909.) filed by State of Vermont. (Murphy, Laura) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Renee O'Brien for Plaintiff the State of Maine (O'Brien, Jillian) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14783202.) filed by State of New York (Lusignan, Brian) (Filed on 8/6/2020) Modified on 8/7/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:20-cv-04869-KAW. #Electronic filing error. R e: #24 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14778315.) filed by District of Columbia (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:20-cv-04869-KAW. #Electronic filing error. Re: #23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14776337.) filed by State of Rhode Island (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Annette Quill.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Carrie Noteboom.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 24 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14778315.) filed by District of Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Caldwell, Brian) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14776337.) filed by State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hoffman, Alison) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14770797.) filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Grandis, David) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14765769.) filed by State of Colorado. (Quill, Annette) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14765687.) filed by State of Colorado. (Noteboom, Carrie) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Gabe Johnson-Karp.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Peter N. Surdo.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Paul Garrahan.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14764845.) filed by State of Wisconsin. (Johnson-Karp, Gabe) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Peter Surdo for the State of Minnesota ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14758790.) filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Surdo, Peter) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14755673.) filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Standing)(Garrahan, Paul) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jason James.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jason James ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14742173.) filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(James, Jason) (Filed on 7/28/2020) Modified on 7/29/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Cindy Chang.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Kelly T. Wood.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mitchell Wieman (Wieman, Catherine) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Cindy Chiang ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14717111.) filed by state of washington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chang, Cindy) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Kelly T. Wood ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14717006.) filed by state of washington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wood, Kelly) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14715838.). Filed bystate of california. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 7/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California et al v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: andrew r. wheeler
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: united states environmental protection agency
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of north carolina
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Taylor H Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of minnesota
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Peter N. Surdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of maryland
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of washington
Represented By: Kelly T Wood
Represented By: Cindy Chang
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of new mexico
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of vermont
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Laura B. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of nevada
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of oregon
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: commonwealth of virginia
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: David Cardwell Grandis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of colorado
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Carrie Noteboom
Represented By: Annette Quill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of illinois
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Jason Elliott James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: commonwealth of massachusetts
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Matthew Ireland
Represented By: Turner H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of wisconsin
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Gabe Johnson-Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: district of columbia
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Brian R Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of michigan
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of rhode island
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Alison B Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of connecticut
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Jill Lacedonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of maine
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Jillian Renee O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of new york
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of new jersey
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Lisa Jo Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state of california
Represented By: Tatiana Koleva Gaur
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Represented By: Catherine Mitchell Wieman
Represented By: Adam Leonard Levitan
Represented By: Bryant B. Cannon
Represented By: Lani Maria Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Montana, State of
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Hydropower Association
Represented By: Charles R Sensiba
Represented By: Sean T H Dutton
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Elizabeth Holt Andrews
Represented By: Andrea West Wortzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: West Virginia, State of
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mississippi, State of
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Kristi H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Missouri, State of
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Texas, State of
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Louisiana, State of
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Elizabeth Murrill
Represented By: Ryan Michael Seidemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wyoming, State of
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: James Kaste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Texas
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of West Virginia
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Montana
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Missouri
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Wyoming
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: James Kaste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Interstate Natural Gas Association of America
Represented By: Deidre G Duncan
Represented By: George Peter Sibley, III
Represented By: Marguerite Clare Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Arkansas
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Mississippi
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Kristi H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Deidre G Duncan
Represented By: George Peter Sibley, III
Represented By: Marguerite Clare Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?