Argo Import Export, Ltd. v. Green Creative, LLC
Plaintiff: Argo Import Export, Ltd.
Defendant: Green Creative, LLC
Petitioner: Jiaxing Super Lighting Electric Appliance Co., LTD.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04882
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #13 Motion to Relate Cases 20-cv-04882 RS and 20-cv-06174 SK. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (cl, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 Administrative MOTION to Consider Whether Case Should be Related) filed by Green Creative, LLC. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 9/14/2020) Modified on 9/15/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Francine Terhune Radford (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Jiaxing Super Lighting Electric Appliance Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Bloch, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Bloch, David) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 8/10/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Argo Import Export, Ltd... (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Green Creative, LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/4/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Argo Import Export, Ltd. . (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Argo Import Export, Ltd. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Green Creative, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14716831.). Filed byArgo Import Export, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 7/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argo Import Export, Ltd. v. Green Creative, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argo Import Export, Ltd.
Represented By: Steven Whitefield Ritcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Creative, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Goodin
Represented By: Francine Terhune Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jiaxing Super Lighting Electric Appliance Co., LTD.
Represented By: David Spencer Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?