Alaska Community Action on Toxics et al v. Council on Environmental Quality et al
Plaintiff: Rio Grande International Study Center, The Wilderness Society, Ocean Conservancy, National Parks Conservation Association, Center for Food Safety, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, We Act For Environmental Justice, Environmental Protection Information Center, Western Watersheds Project, Winter Wildlands Alliance, Friends of the Earth, Environmental Defense Fund, California Wilderness Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Center For Biological Diversity, Food and Water Watch, Alaska Community Action on Toxics, American Alpine Club, Center for Environmental Health and Environment America
Defendant: Mary Neumayr and Council on Environmental Quality
Intervenor: State of California Attorney General's Office
Case Number: 3:2020cv05199
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of the Earth, Environment America, We Act For Environmental Justice, American Alpine Club, Alaska Community Action on Toxics, Western Watersheds Project, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, National Wildlife Federation, Center for Food Safety, California Wilderness Coalition, Environmental Protection Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Winter Wildlands Alliance, Ocean Conservancy, Rio Grande International Study Center, Environmental Defense Fund, Center For Biological Diversity, The Wilderness Society, Food and Water Watch, Center for Environmental Health. Council on Environmental Quality served on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons to United States Attorney, #2 Executed Summons to William Barr, U.S. Attorney General)(Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of the Earth, Environment America, We Act For Environmental Justice, American Alpine Club, Alaska Community Action on Toxics, Western Watersheds Project, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, National Wildlife Federation, Center for Food Safety, California Wilderness Coalition, Environmental Protection Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Winter Wildlands Alliance, Ocean Conservancy, Rio Grande International Study Center, Environmental Defense Fund, Center For Biological Diversity, The Wilderness Society, Food and Water Watch, Center for Environmental Health. Mary Neumayr served on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RELATING CASES 20-05199 RS and 20-06057 KAW. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/8/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 First MOTION to Relate Case 4:20-cv-06057 ) filed byCouncil on Environmental Quality, Mary Neumayr. (Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED to 4:20-cv-06057 filed by State of California Attorney General's Office. (Jefferson, Jamie) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Boronow (Boronow, Clare) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Barclay Thomas Samford (Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020.All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 8/6/20. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alaska Community Action on Toxics, American Alpine Club, California Wilderness Coalition, Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Protection Information Center, Food and Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Federation, Ocean Conservancy, Rio Grande International Study Center, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, We Act For Environmental Justice, Western Watersheds Project, Winter Wildlands Alliance.. (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Council on Environmental Quality, Mary Neumayr. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Jan E. Hasselman. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Susan Jane M. Brown. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jan E. Hasselman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14748720.) filed by AMERICAN ALPINE CLUB, Alaska Community Action on Toxics, California Wilderness Coalition, Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, ENVIRONMENT AMERICA, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Protection Information Center, Food and Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Federation, OCEAN CONSERVANCY, RIO GRANDE INTERNATIONAL STUDY CENTER, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, WE ACT FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE, Western Watersheds Project, Winter Wildlands Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Loarie, Gregory) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Susan Jane M. Brown ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14748650.) filed by AMERICAN ALPINE CLUB, Alaska Community Action on Toxics, California Wilderness Coalition, Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, ENVIRONMENT AMERICA, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Protection Information Center, Food and Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Federation, OCEAN CONSERVANCY, RIO GRANDE INTERNATIONAL STUDY CENTER, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, WE ACT FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE, Western Watersheds Project, Winter Wildlands Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Loarie, Gregory) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN ALPINE CLUB, Alaska Community Action on Toxics, California Wilderness Coalition, Center For Biological Diversity, Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety, ENVIRONMENT AMERICA, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Protection Information Center, Food and Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Federation, OCEAN CONSERVANCY, RIO GRANDE INTERNATIONAL STUDY CENTER, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, WE ACT FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE, Western Watersheds Project, Winter Wildlands Alliance (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Council on Environmental Quality, Mary Neumayr ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14747596.). Filed byFriends of the Earth, ENVIRONMENT AMERICA, WE ACT FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE, AMERICAN ALPINE CLUB, Alaska Community Action on Toxics, Western Watersheds Project, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, National Wildlife Federation, Center for Food Safety, California Wilderness Coalition, Environmental Protection Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Winter Wildlands Alliance, OCEAN CONSERVANCY, RIO GRANDE INTERNATIONAL STUDY CENTER, Environmental Defense Fund, Center For Biological Diversity, The Wilderness Society, Food and Water Watch, Center for Environmental Health. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 7/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaska Community Action on Toxics et al v. Council on Environmental Quality et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rio Grande International Study Center
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocean Conservancy
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: We Act For Environmental Justice
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Protection Information Center
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winter Wildlands Alliance
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Wilderness Coalition
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Wildlife Federation
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Food and Water Watch
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Community Action on Toxics
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Alpine Club
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environment America
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Represented By: Jan E. Hesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Neumayr
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Council on Environmental Quality
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of California Attorney General's Office
Represented By: Jamie B. Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?