Acorn Bay v. CamelBak Products, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Acorn Bay
Defendant: Vista Outdoor Inc. and CamelBak Products, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05214
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acorn Bay Vista Outdoor Inc. served on 09.16.2020 (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acorn Bay Camelbak Products LLC served on 09.16.2020 (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Acorn Bay.. (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
July 30, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. E-filer is reminded to enter all affiliates or corporate parents in future filings when prompted.C orrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Acorn Bay. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to CamelBak Products, LLC, Vista Outdoor Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding U.S. Patent No. 9,609,969 (cc: form mailed to register). (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities identifying Other Affiliates Treasure Bay, Inc. and Acorn Products LLC for Acorn Bay, filed by Acorn Bay. (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/29/2020) Modified on 7/30/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah JoAnn Guske (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acorn Bay ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14751136.). Filed byAcorn Bay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acorn Bay v. CamelBak Products, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Outdoor Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CamelBak Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acorn Bay
Represented By: Sarah JoAnn Guske
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Cauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?