Lundy et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stacy McDaniel, Mose Edward Green, Jr., Vernita M. Simpson, Michael G. Broadway, Roger Evans, David Perez, Stacy Nickerson, Barbara Schurdell, Dennis M. Lewis, Mark Trevor Bennett, Dennis D. Johnson, Michael Stantz, Keith R. Montgomery, James Spears, Charles Patterson, Curtis L. Bewley, Noah Columbus Coleman, Jr., Darryl D. McMurray, Nancy L. Breland, Marstella A. Wade, Michael Hartman, Robert W. Eaton, Robert Moody, Maritza E. Pedre, Secundino Murillos, Jr., Dan Cunningham, Gregory Ward, Ryan DePhillips, Kevin Wayne Adair, Trevor Bradley, Brian Blount, Eddie Perry, James A. Caudhill, Craig Allen Downs Gobel, James Harmon, Jeffery M. Cook, Willis Richard Baker, Jeffrey M. McConnell, David O. Fitzgerald, Gregory S. Ross, Terrance Butler, Carol Richardson, Patrick S. Gordon, Raymond Sanders, Raymond Martin Willard, Paul V. Oates, Jr., James Henry Harper, Brenda Chatman, Mark J. O'Donnell, John James, Russell Ray Royals, Jerry Wayne Hayes, Jr., Anthony H. Lundy, Mary N. Simpson, Todd Jendrick, Christopher Holda and Laron Jackson
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05282
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/23/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2020. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gilead Sciences, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14759864.). Filed byMarstella A. Wade, Mark Trevor Bennett, James A. Caudhill, Christopher Holda, John James, Gregory Ward, Barbara Schurdell, Anthony H. Lundy, Gregory S. Ross, Maritza E. Pedre, Eddie Perry, Raymond Martin Willard, Trevor Bradley, Keith R. Montgomery, Jerry Wayne Hayes, Jr, Kevin Wayne Adair, Willis Richard Baker, Noah Columbus Coleman, Jr, James Spears, Dennis D. Johnson, Ryan DePhillips, Jeffrey M. McConnell, Dan Cunningham, Mark J. O'Donnell, Michael Hartman, Darryl D. McMurray, Terrance Butler, Russell Ray Royals, Paul V. Oates, Jr, James Henry Harper, Robert W. Eaton, Jeffery M. Cook, David O. Fitzgerald, Laron Jackson, Charles Patterson, Secundino Murillos, Jr, Nancy L. Breland, Michael Stantz, Brenda Chatman, Stacy McDaniel, Curtis L. Bewley, David Perez, Patrick S. Gordon, Roger Evans, Dennis M. Lewis, Stacy Nickerson, Craig Allen Downs Gobel, Mose Edward Green, Jr, Brian Blount, Mary N. Simpson, Vernita M. Simpson, Robert Moody, Michael G. Broadway, Raymond Sanders, James Harmon, Carol Richardson, Todd Jendrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/31/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundy et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy McDaniel
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mose Edward Green, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernita M. Simpson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G. Broadway
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Evans
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Perez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Nickerson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Schurdell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis M. Lewis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Trevor Bennett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis D. Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stantz
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith R. Montgomery
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Spears
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Patterson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis L. Bewley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Columbus Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl D. McMurray
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy L. Breland
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marstella A. Wade
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hartman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Eaton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moody
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza E. Pedre
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secundino Murillos, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Cunningham
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Ward
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan DePhillips
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wayne Adair
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Bradley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Blount
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Perry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Caudhill
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Allen Downs Gobel
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Harmon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery M. Cook
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Richard Baker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. McConnell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David O. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory S. Ross
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Butler
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Richardson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick S. Gordon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Sanders
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Martin Willard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul V. Oates, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Henry Harper
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Chatman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark J. O'Donnell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John James
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Ray Royals
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Wayne Hayes, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony H. Lundy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary N. Simpson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Jendrick
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Holda
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laron Jackson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?