Baker et al v. Oregon Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Melania Kang D/B/A Chloe's Cafe, a California general partnership, individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated doing business as Chloe's Cafe, Steven Baker D/B/A Chloe's Cafe, a California general partnership, individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated doing business as Chloe's Cafe and Steven Baker a California general partnership, individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated doing business as Chloe's Cafe
Defendant: Oregon Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05467
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail Acknowledgement filed by Steven Baker, Melania Kang. (Merlin, William) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steven Baker, Melania Kang.. (Veroff, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Oregon Mutual Insurance Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Veroff, Daniel) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Oregon Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14784506.). Filed by Steven Baker, Melania Kang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Veroff, Daniel) (Filed on 8/6/2020) Modified on 8/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Oregon Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melania Kang D/B/A Chloe's Cafe, a California general partnership, individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated doing business as Chloe's Cafe
Represented By: Daniel Jack Veroff
Represented By: Victor J. Jacobellis
Represented By: William F. Merlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Baker D/B/A Chloe's Cafe, a California general partnership, individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated doing business as Chloe's Cafe
Represented By: Daniel Jack Veroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Baker a California general partnership, individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated doing business as Chloe's Cafe
Represented By: Daniel Jack Veroff
Represented By: Victor J. Jacobellis
Represented By: William F. Merlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?