Atkinson v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cameron L. Atkinson
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg and Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05546
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 58 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 57 Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01785. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 MOTION for Clarification 54 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. The Court's #54 Ruling is amended to clarify as follows: The defendants' Motion to Transfer is granted, and the defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is denied without prejudice. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/4/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Clarification #54 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Green, Nicholas)
July 27, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Reis, Julia)
July 27, 2020 Filing 54 RULING granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #51 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/27/2020. (Reis, Julia)
July 17, 2020 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to #51 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. 1) and Supplemental Complaint (Doc. 48) filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Green, Nicholas)
July 3, 2020 Filing 52 Memorandum in Opposition re #51 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. 1) and Supplemental Complaint (Doc. 48) filed by Cameron L. Atkinson. (Pattis, Norman)
June 12, 2020 Filing 51 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. 1) and Supplemental Complaint (Doc. 48) by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.Responses due by 7/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants Supplemental Motion to Dismiss)(Malhotra, Paven)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to File. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/27/2020. (Lewis, D)
May 26, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Rule 12 Motion Within 21 Days by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Green, Nicholas)
May 22, 2020 Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT - Supplemental Complaint pursuant to FRCP 15(d) against All Defendants, filed by Cameron L. Atkinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pattis, Norman)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Complaint by Cameron L. Atkinson. The plaintiff is directed to docket his Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/21/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
April 28, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Complaint by Cameron L. Atkinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Complaint & Exhibit)(Pattis, Norman)
April 6, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Malhotra, Paven)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 4/6/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/18/2020. (Lewis, D)
March 17, 2020 Filing 43 Memorandum in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cameron L. Atkinson. (Pattis, Norman)
March 17, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss until 4/6/2020 by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Reed, Lindsay)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 16, 2020 Reply to the Defendants motion to dismiss. Motion is granted. Plaintiff is directed to docket Opposition. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/17/2020. (Lewis, D)
March 16, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 16, 2020 Reply to the Defendants motion to dismiss by Cameron L. Atkinson. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS)(Pattis, Norman)
March 13, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paven Malhotra to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Malhotra, Paven)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Stay. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/21/2020. (Lewis, D)
February 18, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay All Discovery Pending Adjudication of Defendants Motion To Dismiss by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.Responses due by 3/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants Unopposed Motion To Stay All Discovery)(Green, Nicholas)
February 10, 2020 Filing 36 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 3/12/2020 (Lewis, D)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 MOTION for Extension of Time until 03-12-2020 REPLY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/10/2020. (Lewis, D)
February 10, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay T. Reed on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Reed, Lindsay)
February 6, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time until 03-12-2020 REPLY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Cameron L. Atkinson. (Pattis, Norman)
January 30, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas Green to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Green, Nicholas)
January 30, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Paven Malhotra on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Malhotra, Paven)
January 30, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/6/2020 (DeRubeis, B.)
January 29, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Reiss Green on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Green, Nicholas)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet C. Hall for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/29/2020. (Shafer, J.)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Attorney Nicholas Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Affidavit filed at docket #24 . Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/28/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/28/2020. (Velez, F.)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Attorney Paven Malhotra to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Affidavit filed at #26 . Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/28/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/28/2020. (Velez, F.) Modified on 1/28/2020 to add attorney name (Velez, F.).
January 24, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT re #25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paven Malhotra to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Signed By Paven Malhotra filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Klein, Gary)
January 24, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paven Malhotra to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Klein, Gary)
January 24, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re #23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas Green to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Signed By Nicholas Green filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Klein, Gary)
January 24, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas Green to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Klein, Gary)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to refiling. The motion is denied as the attached affidavit does not comply with the requirements of D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.1(d)(1), which include that the affidavit state the attorney's fax number or the attorney's lack of a fax number; and, for each bar of which the attorney is or has been a member, the affidavit state the corresponding bar identification number or that no identification number has been assigned. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/23/2020. (Dannenmaier, Katherine)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to refiling. The motion is denied as the attached affidavit does not comply with the requirements of D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.1(d)(1), which include that the affidavit state the attorney's fax number or the attorney's lack of a fax number; and, for each bar of which the attorney is or has been a member, the affidavit state the corresponding bar identification number or that no identification number has been assigned. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/23/2020. (Dannenmaier, Katherine)
January 22, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE re #17 MOTION to Dismiss. The parties are reminded that the pendency of a motion to dismiss does not automatically stay discovery, except in cases covered by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act. See Brooks v. Macy's, Inc., No. 10-CIV-5304, 2010 WL 5297756, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 21, 2010) (collecting cases), reh'g denied, No. 10-CIV-5304, 2011 WL 1362191 (S.D.N.Y. Apr. 8, 2011); see also Moran v. Flaherty, No. 92-CV-3200, 1992 WL 276913, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 25, 1992). The court may enter a stay of discovery in its discretion upon a showing [as distinguished from an assertion] of good cause. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c); see also Integrated Sys. & Power, Inc. v. Honeywell Int'l, Inc. , No. 09-CIV-5874, 2009 WL 2777076, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 1, 2009); accord Ellington Credit Fund, Ltd. v. Select Portfolio Servs., Inc. , No. 08-CV-2437, 2009 WL 274483, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 3, 2009). In determining whether good cause exists, the court considers several factors including: (1) whether a defendant has made a strong showing that the plaintiff's claim is unmeritorious, (2) the breadth of discovery and the burden of responding to it, and (3) the risk of unfair prejudice to the party opposing the stay. Negrete v. Citibank, N.A., No. 15-CV-7250, 2015 WL 8207466, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 7, 2015). Other factors include the nature of the case, whether dismissal will resolve the case, effect of dismissal on the scope of discovery, age of the case, complexity of discovery needed, remedy sought, extensions previously granted, parties' diligence, judicial efficiency, and other appropriate factors. Discovery in this case is NOT stayed. Accordingly, any party moving to stay discovery must demonstrate, as oppose to assert, the Court should exercise its discretion to stay the case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/22/2020. (Shafer, J.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT re #18 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #17 MOTION to Dismiss (Declaration) Signed By Nicholas Wong filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Klein, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Klein, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.Responses due by 2/11/2020 (Klein, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas Green to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5649260) Signed By Nicholas Green filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Klein, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas Green to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5649260) by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Klein, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paven Malhotra to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5649251) Signed By Paven Malhotra filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Klein, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paven Malhotra to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5649251) by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Klein, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Klein, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Klein on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Klein, Gary)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cameron L. Atkinson. (Pattis, Norman)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cameron L. Atkinson. All Defendants. (Pattis, Norman)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants filed by Cameron L. Atkinson. (Pattis, Norman)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Norman A. Pattis* *The Pattis Law Firm, LLC* *383 Orange St., First Floor* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Velez, F.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Cameron L. Atkinson, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2019. (Velez, F.)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/12/2019. (Velez, F.)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/12/2019. (Velez, F.)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/12/2019. (Velez, F.)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2020; Discovery due by 5/13/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2019. (Velez, F.)
November 12, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
November 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Pattis, Norman)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5538470.), filed by Cameron L. Atkinson.(Pattis, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkinson v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron L. Atkinson
Represented By: Norman A. Pattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: Lindsay T. Reed
Represented By: Gary Scott Klein
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: Nicholas Reiss Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay T. Reed
Represented By: Gary Scott Klein
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: Nicholas Reiss Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?