Hoopa Valley Tribe v. United States Bureau of Reclamation et al
Plaintiff: Hoopa Valley Tribe
Defendant: United States Department of Interior, David Bernhardt, United States Bureau of Reclamation, Ernest Conant and Brenda Burman
Not Classified By Court: Non-Party San Luis Water District, Non-Party Westlands Water District and Non-Party Panoche Water District
Case Number: 3:2020cv05630
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert M Illman
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of the Motion to Transfer filed by David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, Ernest Conant, United States Bureau of Reclamation, United States Department of Interior. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 10/21/2020. Replies due by 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jeffrey, Thomas) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of California filed by David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, Ernest Conant, United States Bureau of Reclamation, United States Department of Interior. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 10/21/2020. Replies due by 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jeffrey, Thomas) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance of J. Scott Thomas filed by David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, Ernest Conant, United States Bureau of Reclamation, United States Department of Interior. (Jeffrey, Thomas) (Filed on 10/7/2020) Modified on 10/7/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE re #10 Notice filed by Hoopa Valley Tribe. (Schlosser, Thomas) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hoopa Valley Tribe (Schlosser, Thomas) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Non-Party Westlands Water District, Non-Party San Luis Water District, Non-Party Panoche Water District of NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (Larsen, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020.All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 08/19/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hoopa Valley Tribe.. (Schlosser, Thomas) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendants David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, Ernest Conant, United States Bureau of Reclamation, United States Department of Interior. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 2:00 PM in McKinleyville, Chambers. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/27/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Proposed Summons)(Schlosser, Thomas) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Administrative Procedure Act Case) against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14810511). Filed by Hoopa Valley Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlosser, Thomas) (Filed on 8/13/2020) Modified on 8/13/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoopa Valley Tribe v. United States Bureau of Reclamation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoopa Valley Tribe
Represented By: Thomas P. Schlosser
Represented By: Thane D Somerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Thomas Scott Jeffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Thomas Scott Jeffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Thomas Scott Jeffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Conant
Represented By: Thomas Scott Jeffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Burman
Represented By: Thomas Scott Jeffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Non-Party San Luis Water District
Represented By: Cynthia Joy Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Non-Party Westlands Water District
Represented By: Cynthia Joy Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Non-Party Panoche Water District
Represented By: Cynthia Joy Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?