Epic Games, Inc. v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc.
Defendant: Google Ireland Limited, Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Payment Corp., Google Commerce Limited and Google LLC
Interested Party: Peekya Services, Inc., Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc. and Mary Carr
Case Number: 3:2020cv05671
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #53 Motion to Relate Case C-20-6772-JCS. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/8/2020. Status Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:30 a.m. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/08/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/08/2020 before Judge James Donato by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Rishi Pankaj Satia (Satia, Rishi) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Minna L Naranjo (Naranjo, Minna) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Park Chiu (Chiu, Michelle) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Sujal Shah (Shah, Sujal) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Rocca (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 57 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. The case management conference set for October 8, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by October 6, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/2/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020) Modified on 10/2/2020 (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2020 Filing 55 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Peekya Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety under the Motion category. Re : #52 Notice (Other), filed by Peekya Services, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 52 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE by Peekya Services, Inc. of filing of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A- Epic Games, Inc. Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc. Complaint, #4 Exhibit C- Mary Carr Complaint, #5 Exhibit D- Peekya Services, Inc. Complaint, #6 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 9/29/2020) Modified on 9/30/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Filing 51 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. All responses to the complaint, Dkt. No. #1 , are deferred pending further order. The Court sets a status conference for October 8, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom. Instructions will be posted separately. The parties should be prepared to discuss consolidation of the related actions for pretrial and trial purposes. A joint case management statement is due by October 1, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/18/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 49 STIPULATION For Extension Of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint filed by Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE by Mary Carr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mary Carr's Opposition/Response re 56 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #2 Exhibit 1a - Epic v. Google Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1b - Carr v. Google Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1c - Pure Sweat Basketball v. Google Complaint, #5 Exhibit 1d - Order Relating Pure Sweat Basketball v. Google to Epic v. Google, #6 Exhibit 1e - Order Relating Carr v. Google to Epic v. Google, #7 Exhibit 1f - Feitelson v. Google Complaint)(Boyer, Jamie) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #45 Notice (Other) of Filing Opposition to Adminstrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Epic Games, Inc. Notice of Filing Opposition to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related)(Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/10/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE by Google LLC of filing of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14922032.) filed by Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Tom, Willard) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14922022.) filed by Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Taffet, Richard) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #34 Administrative Motion to relate C-20-5792 EMC. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14918363.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (NY))(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Mary Carr re #34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Pursuant to Local Rule 3-12, relation of Carr v. Google to Epic v. Google Response to Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purposes of Determining Relationship of Cases Mary Carr vs. Google LLC, etal, Case No. 20-cv-5761 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mary Carr's Response to SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purposes of Determining Relationship of Cases, #2 Exhibit 1a - Epic v. Google Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1b - Carr v. Google Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1c - Epic-Carr Comparison Chart, #5 Exhibit 1d - Feitelson v. Google Complaint)(Boyer, Jamie) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Epic Games, Inc. Google Payment Corp. served on 9/4/20, answer due 9/25/20. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/8/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. of Summons and Complaint and supplemental papers on Google Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. of Summons and Complaint and supplemental papers on Google Commerce Limited (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. of Summons and Complaint and supplemental papers on Google Ireland Limited (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Epic Games, Inc. Google LLC served on 9/4/20, answer due 9/25/20. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/8/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2020 Filing 34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Pursuant to Local Rule 3-12, relation of Carr v. Google to Epic v. Google Response to Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purposes of Determining Relationship of Cases filed by Mary Carr. Responses due by 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Epic v. Google Complaint, #2 Exhibit Carr v. Google Complaint, #3 Exhibit Epic/Carr Comparison Chart, #4 Exhibit Feitelson v. Google Complaint)(Boyer, Jamie) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE re #25 Order Sua Sponte Referring Case for Determining Relationship of Cases by Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert F. Lopez, #2 Exhibit Lopez Exhibits 1-3, #3 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE re #25 Order by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google LLC, Google Payment Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Rishi Pankaj Satia (Satia, Rishi) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Minna L Naranjo (Naranjo, Minna) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Park Chiu (Chiu, Michelle) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Sujal Shah (Shah, Sujal) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Rocca (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 25 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Cases 20-cv-5792-EMC; 19-cv-3074-YGR; 20-cv-5640-YGR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Epic Games, Inc... (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 **FILED IN ERROR** TRANSCRIPT ORDER is filed in 4:20-cv-05640 YGR for proceedings held on 8/24/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc. Court Reporter is Diane Skillman. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/25/2020 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Michael Brent Byars Pro Hac Vice representing Epic Games, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Yonatan Even Pro Hac Vice representing Epic Games, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Christine A. Varney representing Epic Games, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Katherine B. Forrest Pro Hac Vice representing Epic Games, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Gary Bornstein Pro Hac Vice representing Epic Games, Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14813907.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14813895.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14813880.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Varney, Christine) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14813830.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14813804.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Epic Games, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14813578.). Filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Games, Inc. v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Ireland Limited
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Payment Corp.
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Willard K Tom
Represented By: Richard S. Taffet
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Commerce Limited
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Rishi Pankaj Satia
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Willard K Tom
Represented By: Richard S. Taffet
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Christine A Varney
Represented By: Katherine B. Forrest
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Represented By: Michael Brent Byars
Represented By: Yonatan Even
Represented By: Gary Andrew Bornstein
Represented By: Lauren Ann Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Peekya Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mary Carr
Represented By: Jamie L Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?