Sidwell v. Monsanto
Plaintiff: Michael J. Sidwell
Defendant: Monsanto
Case Number: 3:2020cv05772
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rand Patrick Nolen (Nolen, Rand) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
August 18, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Utah, 4:20-cv-00078, Sidwell v. Monsanto, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-5772-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order #8 cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 4:20-cv-00078. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER of Conditional Transfer re Roundup Products Liability Litigation MDL 2741 signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (jwt)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Sidwell as to Monsanto served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Zabriskie, Rhome)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/27/20 (alt)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/27/2020. (pjd)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURTThis case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Monsanto. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Monsanto (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3659754) filed by Michael J. Sidwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Zabriskie, Rhome)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Michael J. Sidwell is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sidwell v. Monsanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Sidwell
Represented By: Rhome D. Zabriskie
Represented By: Rand Patrick Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Represented By: Eric Gordon Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?