Cornejo v. Tumlin et al
Plaintiff: Marimar Cornejo
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco, Cameron A. Hale, Pacific Gas & Electric Company, Alvah Contractors Inc., Dan Scanlan, Tegsco LLC doing business as San Francisco Autoreturn, San Francisco Autoreturn LLC, San Francisco Municipal Transportation Agency, Nelsons Tow and Jeffrey Tumlin
Case Number: 3:2020cv05813
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on November 20, 2020 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by City & County of San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 10/23/2020. Replies due by 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Kwan, Natassia) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) filed by Pacific Gas & Electric Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 10/16/2020. Replies due by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #(1) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF PROCEDURE 12(b)(6))(Duncan, Sara) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to re #1 Complaint filed by Alvah Contractors Inc.. (Codog, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Natassia Kwan (Kwan, Natassia) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Pacific Gas & Electric Company. (Duncan, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #9 Administrative Motion. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint filed by City & County of San Francisco, Jeffrey Tumlin. Responses due by 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Raymond Rollan, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Rollan, Raymond) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Nelsons Tow, San Francisco Autoreturn LLC, Dan Scanlan, Tegsco LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Emblidge, G.) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #2 Application for TRO. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Defendants Alvah Contractors Inc., City & County of San Francisco, Cameron A. Hale, Nelsons Tow, Pacific Gas & Electric Company, San Francisco Autoreturn LLC, San Francisco Municipal Transportation Agency, Dan Scanlan, Tegsco LLC, Jeffrey Tumlin. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE filed by Marimar Cornejo. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES & INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (42 U.S.C 1983, 1988; and pendent tort claims); JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Alvah Contractors Inc., City & County of San Francisco, Cameron A. Hale, Nelsons Tow, Pacific Gas & Electric Company, San Francisco Autoreturn LLC, San Francisco Municipal Transportation Agency, Dan Scanlan, Tegsco LLC, Jeffrey Tumlin, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 34611150389). Filed byMarimar Cornejo. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet, #(2) Filing Fee Receipt)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornejo v. Tumlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marimar Cornejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Represented By: Natassia Kwan
Represented By: Raymond R. Rollan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron A. Hale
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schumaker
Represented By: Benjamin J. Codog, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Represented By: Sara Duncan
Represented By: Gayle L. Gough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvah Contractors Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schumaker
Represented By: Benjamin J. Codog, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Scanlan
Represented By: Evan M Rosenbaum
Represented By: G. Scott Emblidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tegsco LLC doing business as San Francisco Autoreturn
Represented By: Evan M Rosenbaum
Represented By: G. Scott Emblidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Autoreturn LLC
Represented By: Evan M Rosenbaum
Represented By: G. Scott Emblidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Municipal Transportation Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelsons Tow
Represented By: Evan M Rosenbaum
Represented By: G. Scott Emblidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Tumlin
Represented By: Natassia Kwan
Represented By: Raymond R. Rollan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?