Stanford Health Care. A California non-profit public benefit corporation v. CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stanford Health Care. A California non-profit public benefit corporation
Defendant: CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05824
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #15 Stipulation Continuing Deadlines and date of Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, #12 Stipulation to December 15, 2020 filed by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(von Behren, William) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stanford Health Care. A California non-profit public benefit corporation (Lam, Barbara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stanford Health Care. A California non-profit public benefit corporation PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (Lam, Barbara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to extend time to respond to complaint filed by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.. (von Behren, William) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. CAREFIRST OF MARYLAND,INC. (Lewis, Carol) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE on Reassignment and Setting Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 SI Standing Order, #2 All Judges Standing Order) (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Susan Illston. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stanford Health Care. A California non-profit public benefit corporation.. (Lam, Barbara) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lam, Barbara) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14831141.). Filed byStanford Health Care. A California non-profit public benefit corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lam, Barbara) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford Health Care. A California non-profit public benefit corporation v. CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: William E. von Behren
Represented By: Carol Burney Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Health Care. A California non-profit public benefit corporation
Represented By: Barbara V. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?