Centro Legal de la Raza v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Plaintiff: Centro Legal de la Raza
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 3:2020cv05839
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanti Tharayil (Tharayil, Shanti) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Bureau of Prisons.. (Samples, John) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byFederal Bureau of Prisons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Samples, John) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Samples, John) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Wesley Samples (Samples, John) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Centro Legal de la Raza (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Centro Legal de la Raza.. (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Centro Legal de la Raza (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act against Federal Bureau of Prisons ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14834577.). Filed byCentro Legal de la Raza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment)(Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centro Legal de la Raza v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centro Legal de la Raza
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Weissman Ward
Represented By: Shanti Tharayil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: John Wesley Samples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?