Hurricane Electric, LLC v. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Plaintiff: Hurricane Electric, LLC
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Case Number: 3:2020cv05840
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 Proposed Order re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant National Fire's Duty to Defend by Hurricane Electric, LLC. (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 26 Declaration of David A. Gauntlett in Support of #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant National Fire's Duty to Defend filed byHurricane Electric, LLC. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 Declaration of Neil D. Greenstein in Support of #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant National Fire's Duty to Defend filed byHurricane Electric, LLC. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 EXHIBITS re #23 Declaration in Support, Exhibit 6 to Declaration of James Heppes filed byHurricane Electric, LLC. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of James Heppes in Support of #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant National Fire's Duty to Defend filed byHurricane Electric, LLC. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 Declaration of Benny Ng in Support of #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant National Fire's Duty to Defend filed byHurricane Electric, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant National Fire's Duty to Defend filed by Hurricane Electric, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 10/27/2020. Replies due by 11/3/2020. (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on October 30, 2020 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #17 Stipulation. Opposition due by 10/27/2020. Replies due by 11/3/2020. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of James Lowe in Support of #17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Modify Briefing And Hearing Schedule for Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed byHurricane Electric, LLC. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Modify Briefing And Hearing Schedule for Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Hurricane Electric, LLC. (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Corey Rider in Support of #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed byNational Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Christensen, Robert) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 10/15/2020. Replies due by 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Christensen, Robert) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company for National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Christensen, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint byNational Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Christensen, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hurricane Electric, LLC Proof Of Service (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: C20-3813 CRB and C20-5840 DMR. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/24/2020. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Summons Incomplete- Enter Plaintiff or Plaintiff Attorney's Name and Address. Please re-file Summons in its entirety. Re: #5 Proposed Summons filed by Hurricane Electric, LLC (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Summons Incomplete. Please re-file summons in its entirety. Re: #4 Proposed Summons filed by Hurricane Electric, LLC (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Hurricane Electric, LLC . (Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14835071.). Filed byHurricane Electric, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Gauntlett, David) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/20/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurricane Electric, LLC v. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Robert Charles Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hurricane Electric, LLC
Represented By: David A. Gauntlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?