Jones v. TDCJ-ID Inspector Spy Contracts
Plaintiff: Elvis Wayne Jones
Defendant: Polk County, TDCJ-ID Inspector Spy Contracts and Texas Controllers of Public Accounts
Case Number: 3:2020cv05841
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: PSLC LLH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Case transferred to U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division via ECF. New case number - 9:20-cv-00185. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/28/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Submitted #2 CLERK'S NOTICE, #3 CLERK'S NOTICE, #4 NOTICE for mailing. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 9/28/2020. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/28/2020. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TDCJ-ID Inspector Spy Contracts, Texas Controllers of Public Accounts, Polk County. (IFPP) No Process. Filed byElvis Wayne Jones. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. TDCJ-ID Inspector Spy Contracts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDCJ-ID Inspector Spy Contracts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Controllers of Public Accounts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?