Speck v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: John Speck
Defendant: VIGOR INDUSTRIAL LLC (individually and as successor-in-interest to TODD SHIPYARD CORPORATION), 3M COMPANY f/k/a MINNESOTA MINING, MetalClad Insulation LLC, General Cable Industries, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, Eaton Corporation, Pneumo-Abex LLC, General Electric Company, Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc., Plastics Engineering Company, Crane Co., Vigor Industrial LLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Howden North America, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation and 3M Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05845
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Occidental Chemical Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons of Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation)(Lewis, Stephen) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen UPDATED (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 61 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGeneral Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE by Pneumo-Abex LLC of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Tugade, Edward) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 57 Statement per FRCP 7.1 (disclosure) by Pneumo-Abex LLC. (Tugade, Edward) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward P Tugade (for Pneumo-Abex, LLC) (Tugade, Edward) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RSCC Wire & Cable LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for RSCC Wire & Cable LLC. Defendant RSCC Wire & Cable LLCs corporate disclosure statement and certification of interested entities or persons (Gaye, Samlecia) (Filed on 10/1/2020) Modified on 10/1/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE by RSCC Wire & Cable LLC DEFENDANT RSCC WIRE & CABLE LLC, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RSCC WIRE & CABLE, LLCS (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ROCKBESTOS COMPANY) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY CLAIMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gaye, Samlecia) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 53 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, by General Dynamics Corporation. (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint byGeneral Dynamics Corporation. (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE by Howden North America, Inc. Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint and State Court Jury Demand (Strunk, Christopher) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint and State Court Jury Demand (Scadden, James) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 49 Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation's Notice of Re-Filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint byOccidental Chemical Corporation. (Lewis, Stephen) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eaton Corporation (Cormier, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Anne Cormier By Defendant Eaton Corporation (Cormier, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 46 Defendant Eaton Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byEaton Corporation. (Cormier, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 45 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Plastics Engineering Company.. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Document filed with wrong case number. [err401]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety with correct case num ber. Re: #42 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Plastics Engineering Company (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/3/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 43 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by 3M Company.. (Fahr, Samantha) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 42 **Please see #45 for correction** CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Plastics Engineering Company.. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 9/2/2020) Modified on 9/3/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Notice of Re-Filing State Court Answer byPlastics Engineering Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STATE ANSWER)(Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by Plastics Engineering Company and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 38 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by General Cable Industries, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Cable Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Draka Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate GK Technologies, Inc., Other Affiliate Prsymian S.p.A., Other Affiliate General Cable Corporation for General Cable Industries, Inc.. re #32 Notice of Appearance (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 36 Notice Of Re-Filing Of State Court ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMorse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation. (Heidarzadeh, Shayan) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 35 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation.. (Heidarzadeh, Shayan) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Enstar Holdings (US) LLC, a wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Enstar Group Limited for Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation. (Heidarzadeh, Shayan) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Shayan Heidarzadeh for Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC As Successor-By-Merger To Borg-Warner Corporation (Heidarzadeh, Shayan) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park DEFENDANT GENERAL CABLE INDUSTRIES, INC.S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Park, Charles) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Vigor Industrial LLC (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2020 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by MetalClad Insulation LLC (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 29 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MetalClad Insulation LLC.. (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy Mai Huynh Counsel for Metalclad Insulation LLC (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by MetalClad Insulation LLC of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Extend Time For Crane Co. to Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Crane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Elizabeth Fahr , Mordecai D. Boone and Stephanie Peatman for 3M Company (Fahr, Samantha) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by 3M Company re #20 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Jackson, Samantha) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by3M Company. (Jackson, Samantha) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ViacomCBS Inc... (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Speck.. (Jones, Harris Webster) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vigor Industrial LLC.. (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/8/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by ViacomCBS Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Amusement, Inc., Other Affiliate ViacomCBS Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byViacomCBS Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Vigor Industrial, LLC by ViacomCBS Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byVIGOR INDUSTRIAL LLC (individually and as successor-in-interest to TODD SHIPYARD CORPORATION). (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIGOR INDUSTRIAL LLC (individually and as successor-in-interest to TODD SHIPYARD CORPORATION) identifying Corporate Parent The Carlyle Group, Corporate Parent Miles Marine, Inc., Corporate Parent Vigor Shipyards, Inc., Corporate Parent Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. for VIGOR INDUSTRIAL LLC (individually and as successor-in-interest to TODD SHIPYARD CORPORATION). AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Demian David Steele (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by VIGOR INDUSTRIAL LLC (individually and as successor-in-interest to TODD SHIPYARD CORPORATION) . (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1442(a)(1); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG-20-062294. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14835536). Filed byVIGOR INDUSTRIAL LLC (individually and as successor-in-interest to TODD SHIPYARD CORPORATION). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Steele, Demian) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speck v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIGOR INDUSTRIAL LLC (individually and as successor-in-interest to TODD SHIPYARD CORPORATION)
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY f/k/a MINNESOTA MINING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetalClad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Michelle Christian Jackson
Represented By: Kathy Mai Huynh
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Sheila G. O'Gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Cable Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Represented By: Paul D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable LLC
Represented By: Samlecia D Gaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Bradley P. Kaplan
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex LLC
Represented By: John R. Brydon
Represented By: Edward P Tugade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Shayan Heidarzadeh
Represented By: Kimberly Chew
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: James G Scadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastics Engineering Company
Represented By: Thomas Pahl
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Industrial LLC
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Crawford Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howden North America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Strunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Paul M. Bessette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Stephanie G Peatman
Represented By: Samantha Elizabeth Fahr
Represented By: Mordecai D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Speck
Represented By: Harris Webster Trey Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?