Dixon v. Warden
Petitioner: Damon L. Dixon
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 3:2020cv05846
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson denying #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Mailing Label)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Damon L. Dixon. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Damon L. Dixon, CDCR # A20223.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Damon L. Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
August 26, 2020 Submitted #2 CLERK'S NOTICE and #3 Notice of Assignment for mailing. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/28/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Damon L. Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damon L. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?