De La Cruz v. Saul
Plaintiff: James De La Cruz
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv05852
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James De La Cruz.. (Zalev, Suzanne) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO INFORM COURT WHETHER HE CONSENTS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 14, 2020. (Attachment: #1 )(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul.. (Bradt, Lara) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 4, 2020 Summons and waiver emailed to SSA and DOJ (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 3, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James De La Cruz. (Zalev, Suzanne) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. The Application is denied, without prejudice to plaintiff's filing, no later than September 18, 2020, an amended Application. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James De La Cruz. (Zalev, Suzanne) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul. Filed byJames De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zalev, Suzanne) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Cruz v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James De La Cruz
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Zalev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Lara Anne Oravec Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?