Blank and Cables, Inc. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Blank and Cables, Inc.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05856
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & Proposed Order filed by Blank and Cables, Inc.. (Pearson, Kirk) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pearson, Kirk) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Topor, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Howard, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byWells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Howard, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byBlank and Cables, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pearson, Kirk) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RENOTICING MOTION HEARING BEFORE JUDGE EDWARD M. CHEN: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Briefing deadlines remain unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco. Motion Heari ng set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Amendment to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.s Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss Complaint). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.s Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Howard, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/8/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Cardasis, Margaret) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Howard, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Cardasis, Margaret) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 9/9/2020. Replies due by 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.s Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Howard, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Topor (Topor, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/22/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Cardasis, Margaret) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Cardasis, Margaret) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California in and for the County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20065553. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14837268). Filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cardasis, Margaret) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blank and Cables, Inc. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Benjamin J Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Margaret T Cardasis
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Topor
Represented By: Tomio Buck Narita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blank and Cables, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk C Pearson
Represented By: Paul H. Deese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?