Ramsey v. Saul
Plaintiff: Yves Ramsey
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv05956
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yves Ramsey.. (Alexander, Yonina) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Bolin, Timothy) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set as control date for 2/25/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Receipt re #6 Summons Issued (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Receipt re #6 Summons Issued. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 ***Summons and waiver e-mailed to SSA*** (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Yves Ramsey. (Alexander, Yonina) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA. Filed byYves Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Yonina) (Filed on 8/24/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsey v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Timothy R. Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yves Ramsey
Represented By: Yonina E Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?