Finney v. Saul
Plaintiff: Darrell Finney
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv06013
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 Acknowledgment of Receipt of re #13 Summons Issued. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 16, 2020 summons in a civil action; waiver of service of summons, and copy of: re #1 complaint, re #12 order re ifp, and re #8 scheduling order - emailed to Social Security Administration and the United States Attorneys Office. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darrell Finney. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #6 Motion for Exemption from Payment of Pacer User Fees. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER (Social Security Review Action). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/16/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION FOR EXEMPTION FROM PAYMENT OF PACER FEES, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Darrell Finney. Responses due by 9/15/2020. Replies due by 9/22/2020. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Darrell Finney.. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darrell Finney. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Darrell Finney . (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 27, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Case can not be randomly assigned to judge due to missing Civil Cover Sheet and lack of filing fee having been paid. Submit your document using Civil Ev ents > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Darrell Finney (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF DECISION OF COMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY against Andrew M. Saul. Filed by Darrell Finney. (Waggoner, David) (Filed on 8/26/2020) Modified on 9/2/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finney v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Finney
Represented By: David P. Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?