State of California et al v. Council on Environmental Quality et al
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina, State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, State of Washington, State of New Mexico, State of Vermont, State of Nevada, State of Oregon, State of Colorado, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, State of Illinois, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Territory of Guam, State of Wisconsin, District of Columbia, City of New York, State of Rhode Island, State of Delaware, People of the State of Michigan, State of Connecticut, State of Maine, State of New York, Harris County, Texas, State of New Jersey, Connecticut Department of Energy and Environmental Protection and State of California
Defendant: Mary Neumayr and Council on Environmental Quality
Case Number: 3:2020cv06057
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Morrisseau, Morri (Morrisseau, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for October 29, 2020 is continued to December 17, 2020 at 10:00 AM. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Call at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. Case Management Statement due by December 10, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah Jane Utley.(clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15089519.) filed by Harris County, Texas. (Utley, Sarah) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Elizabeth Morrisseau. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15088334.) filed by People of the State of Michigan. (Morrisseau, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 52 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jefferson, Jamie) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 51 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Asher P. Spiller. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Asher P. Spiller ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15014921.) filed by State of North Carolina. (Spiller, Asher) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Heidi Parry Stern. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15005384.) filed by State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Stern, Heidi) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert D. Snook. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14951956.) filed by State of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Snook, Robert) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ann R. Johnston. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 43 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-14924382.) filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnston, Ann) (Filed on 9/10/2020) Modified on 9/11/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Turner Smith. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Ireland. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14919854.) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Turner) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14919761.) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ireland, Matthew) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory S. Schultz. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Scott Steinbrecher. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Renee O'Brien on behalf of Plaintiff State of Maine (O'Brien, Jillian) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RELATING CASES 20-05199 RS and 20-06057 KAW. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/8/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14912189.) filed by State of Rhode Island. (Schultz, Gregory) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #7 Summons Issued, #19 Certificate of Service, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint,,, #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, upon U.S. Atty.'s Office and U.S. Atty. Genl. (Purtle, Joshua) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Scott Steinbrecher ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14903002.) filed by State of Colorado. (Steinbrecher, Scott) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Alacoque Hinga Nevitt (Nevitt, Alacoque) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Joseph A. Perez.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Claiborne Ellis Walthall.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Paul Garrahan.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Steve Novick.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Emily M. Ertel.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jason James.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Peter N Surdo.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Marie Caroline Harris.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Aurora Rose Janke.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14895864.) filed by Territory of Guam. (Perez, Joseph) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #7 Summons Issued, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint,,, #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, upon Defendants (Purtle, Joshua) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Boronow (Boronow, Clare) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Jo Morelli (Morelli, Lisa) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14887267.) filed by New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Walthall, Claiborne) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14887168.) filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Garrahan, Paul) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14886808.) filed by State of Oregon. (Novick, Steven) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14885038.) filed by State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ertel, Emily) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jason James ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14885231.) filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(James, Jason) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Barclay Thomas Samford (Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Peter Surdo for the State of Minnesota ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14884929.) filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing MN)(Surdo, Peter) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 ***Incorrect PDF attached*** NOTICE of Appearance by Barclay Thomas Samford (Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 9/1/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Council on Environmental Quality, Mary Neumayr (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2020 01:30 PM. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Council on Environmental Quality. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth Marie Caroline Harris ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14882326.) filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Aurora Janke ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14880980.) filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Janke, Aurora) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/11/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Kathryn Forgie on behalf of Plaintiff State of California (Forgie, Julia) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Purtle, Joshua) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Council on Environmental Quality, Mary Neumayr ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14873004.). Filed by State of New Jersey, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Maine, Connecticut Department of Energy and Environmental Protection, State of Washington, State of Vermont, Territory of Guam, State of California, State of Wisconsin, State of Rhode Island, State of New York, District of Columbia, City of New York, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, State of Illinois, State of Colorado, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of North Carolina, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, Harris County, Texas, State of Nevada, People of the State of Michigan, State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Purtle, Joshua) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California et al v. Council on Environmental Quality et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Asher Paris Spiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Peter N. Surdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Caroline Harris
Represented By: Aurora Janke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Steven Novick
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Scott Steinbrecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York State Department of Environmental Conservation
Represented By: Claiborne Ellis Walthall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Jason Elliott James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Ann R. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Matthew Ireland
Represented By: Turner H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Territory of Guam
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Emily Marie Ertel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Alacoque Hinga Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Gregory Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of Michigan
Represented By: Elizabeth Morrisseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Robert D. Snook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maine
Represented By: Jillian Renee O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Claiborne Ellis Walthall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris County, Texas
Represented By: Sarah Jane Utley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Lisa Jo Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connecticut Department of Energy and Environmental Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Joshua R Purtle
Represented By: Julia Kathryn Forgie
Represented By: Jamie B. Jefferson
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Neumayr
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Council on Environmental Quality
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?