Jaramillo v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shane Jaramillo
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv06214
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shane Jaramillo.. (Fraser, Brian) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/28/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul.. (Kenney, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Remark: Summons and waiver emailed to SSA. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Shane Jaramillo- No proposed summons has been submitted. Please submit proposed summons for the Court to issue. (elyS, COUR T STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shane Jaramillo. (Fraser, Brian) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Shane Jaramillo (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW against Andrew M. Saul. Filed byShane Jaramillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fraser, Brian) (Filed on 9/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaramillo v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Jaramillo
Represented By: Brian Cameron Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?