Henriquez v. Wolf et al
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli, William P. Barr, Chad Wolf and John Kramar
Petitioner: Edwin Alberto Henriquez
Case Number: 3:2020cv06278
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwin Alberto Henriquez (Heilbrun, Sarah Kate) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edwin Alberto Henriquez.. (Heilbrun, Sarah Kate) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, John Kramar, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/18/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Heilbrun, Sarah Kate) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION For De Novo Naturalization Hearing against William P. Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, John Kramar, Chad Wolf (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14903183). Filed byEdwin Alberto Henriquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Permanent Resident Card, #2 Exhibit Certified Minutes, #3 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit I-261, #5 Exhibit Order Vacating Judgment, #6 Exhibit Order of the Immigration Judge, #7 Exhibit Naturalization Interview Results, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heilbrun, Sarah Kate) (Filed on 9/4/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henriquez v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Alberto Henriquez
Represented By: Sarah Kate Heilbrun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?