Gordon et al v. State Bar of California et al
Plaintiff: Isabel Callejo-Brighton, Kara Gordon and John Doe
Defendant: National Conference of Bar Examiners, State Bar of California and Donna Hershkowitz
Case Number: 3:2020cv06442
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER of USCA as to #57 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Doe, Isabel Callejo-Brighton, Kara Gordon. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Isabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 64 STIPULATION re #24 Amended Complaint to Extend Time for Defendant National Conference of Bar Examiners to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by National Conference of Bar Examiners. (Nugent, Maria) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth John Holloway (Holloway, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 62 Declaration of Amy Nunez in Support of #60 Defendants State Bar of California and Donna Hershkowitz's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Declaration of Amy Nunez in Support of Defendants State Bar of California and Donna Hershkowitz's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Donna Hershkowitz, State Bar of California. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Chang, James) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 61 [Proposed] Order Granting re #60 Defendants State Bar of California and Donna Hershkowitz's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants State Bar of California's and Donna Hershkowitz's Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Donna Hershkowitz, State Bar of California. (Chang, James) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 60 Defendants State Bar of California and Donna Hershkowitz's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Donna Hershkowitz, State Bar of California. Responses due by 10/21/2020. Replies due by 10/28/2020. (Chang, James) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER of USCA as to #57 Notice of Appeal filed by John Doe, Isabel Callejo-Brighton, Kara Gordon (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 58 USCA Case Number 20-16899 for #57 Notice of Appeal filed by John Doe, Isabel Callejo-Brighton, Kara Gordon. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Isabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon. Appeal of Order on Motion for TRO #56 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-15007390 paid) (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (USCA Case No. 20-16899)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. In the attached order, the court denies the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction #6 . (lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held via Zoom on 9/30/2020. Matter is argued, submitted and taken under submission. Court to issue order. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 2 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Claudia Center and Malhar Parimal. Defendants' State Bar of CA and Donna Hershkowitz Attorneys : James Chang and Vanessa Holton.Defendant National Conference of Bar Examiners Attorney: Robert Burgoyne. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 54 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) Surresponse filed byDonna Hershkowitz, State Bar of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Nunez)(Chang, James) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 53 Declaration of Dr. Jeffrey Klausner in Support of #44 Opposition/Response to Motion, Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Jeffrey Klausner filed byDonna Hershkowitz, State Bar of California. (Related document(s) #44 ) (Chang, James) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER regarding #50 Administrative Motion to file a sur-reply. The court just saw the plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a sur-reply and the State Bar's opposition to it. The sur-reply addresses the Nunez declaration and the Klausner declaration. As to the Nunez declaration, the State Bar filed it after the plaintiffs' reply brief, and the court allows the sur-reply. If the State Bar wants to respond, the court is amenable to that process but thinks that the plaintiffs' arguments do not meaningfully expand their earlier arguments and fact submissions through the Gonzalez declarations. As to the new analysis of the Klausner declaration, a response from the State Bar would be helpful, especially because the issues are already in the record. Given the need to issue an order on the pending motion quickly, the court would appreciate the State Bar's filing a response as soon as is practicable. The court can discuss the timing of that supplemental submission at tomorrow's hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 51 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #50 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To File Surreply ISO TRO and PI re #48 Declaration in Support, ) State Bar Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Surreply filed byDonna Hershkowitz, State Bar of California. (Chang, James) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 50 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To File Surreply ISO TRO and PI re #48 Declaration in Support, filed by Isabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon. Responses due by 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Surreply ISO Motion for TRO-PI, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jinny Kim ISO Administrative Motion To File Surreply, #3 Proposed Order)(Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 #Electronic filing error re: #48 Declaration in Support filed by State Bar of California, Donna Hershkowitz. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Offic e. No further action is necessary. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/30/2020 09:30 AM. The court thinks it would be useful to have the State Bar's response to the plaintiffs' sur-reply before the preliminary-injunction hearing. The court asks the State Bar to file it by 2 p.m. on Tuesday, September 29, 2020. (It can but need not address the argument about the Nunez declaration. If the State Bar wants to address the Nunez argument, it may do so in a separate submission filed no later than September 29 at 5 p.m.) The court continues the hearing one day, until September 30, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 26, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support re #44 Opposition/Response to Motion by Donna Hershkowitz, State Bar of California (Chang, James) (Filed on 9/26/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2020 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Amy Nunez in Support of Opposition to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Donna Hershkowitz, State Bar of California. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Chang, James) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY (re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Isabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Defendant NCBE, #2 Reply Declaration of Jinny Kim and Exhibits A-F, #3 Reply Declaration of Dr. Amy Day, #4 Reply Declaration of Kara Gordon and Exhibit A, #5 Reply Declaration of Isabel Callejo-Brighton, #6 Reply Declaration of John Doe and Exhibits A-C, #7 Reply Declaration of Dr. Julie DeAun Graves, #8 Reply Declaration of Gabriel Gonzalez)(Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/24/2020) Modified on 9/25/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2020 Filing 46 Letter from James Chang (for Defendants State Bar of CA and Donna Hershkowitz) re Witnesses at Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (Chang, James) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Sydney Rae Pickern (Pickern, Sydney) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 44 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byDonna Hershkowitz, State Bar of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donna Hershkowitz and Exhibits A to J, #2 Declaration of Dr. Jeffrey Klausner and Exhibits A to E)(Chang, James) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 43 Declaration of Beth Hill in Support of #42 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byNational Conference of Bar Examiners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #42 ) (Nugent, Maria) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 42 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byNational Conference of Bar Examiners. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nugent, Maria) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert A. Burgoyne representing Defendant National Conference of Bar Examiners. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14970725.) filed by National Conference of Bar Examiners. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burgoyne, Robert) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Nora Kathleen Cassidy (Cassidy, Nora) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 38 Amended Summons Issued as to National Conference of Bar Examiners. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 37 Proposed Order re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order -- Amended by Isabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon. (Center, Claudia) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #2 Administrative Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 20, 2020 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT track changes version against All Defendants. Filed byKara Gordon, John Doe, Isabel Callejo-Brighton. (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. The court asks the plaintiffs to file as soon as is practicable a blackline (track changes) version of the amended complaint so that the court can see easily how it differs from the original complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. Under normal circumstances, the court would accommodate counsel's request for a two-day extension. But this is a motion for a TRO/preliminary injunction. The court does not see how it can set the hearing any later, and it needs all filings for the preliminary injunction by next Thursday. Also, the declaration is modest and unremarkable. For those reasons, the court denies the motion for an extension and the motion to strike. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/20/2020)
September 19, 2020 Filing 31 Response re #30 Objection to Declaration of Gabriel Gonzalez byIsabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon. (Center, Claudia) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 30 OBJECTIONS to #23 Declaration in Support by Donna Hershkowitz, State Bar of California. (Chang, James) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 29 Proposed Summons. (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 28 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kara Gordon, John Doe, Isabel Callejo-Brighton as to National Conference of Bar Examiners. (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Donna Hershkowitz. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 26 Proposed Summons. (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Isabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon. Amendment to #4 Proposed Summons . (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 24 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Donna Hershkowitz, National Conference of Bar Examiners, State Bar of California. Filed by Kara Gordon, John Doe, Isabel Callejo-Brighton. (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/18/2020) Modified on 9/18/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of Gabriel Gonzalez in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byIsabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Center, Claudia) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 Statement of Non-Opposition re #2 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Proceed pseudonymously re #1 Complaint filed by National Conference of Bar Examiners. (Nugent, Maria) (Filed on 9/18/2020) Modified on 9/18/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 #Electronic filing error re: #25 Amended Document filed by John Doe, Isabel Callejo-Brighton, Kara Gordon. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office as there is cu rrently a summons outstanding for the named defendant (see doc no. #11 ). If counsel wishes to have a new summons issued, the outstanding summons must first be returned using < < < < (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 Statement of Non-Opposition re #2 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Proceed pseudonymously re #1 Complaint filed by State Bar of California. (Chang, James) (Filed on 9/17/2020) Modified on 9/18/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE: There are two pending administrative motions: an administrative motion to proceed pseudonymously (filed on September 14, 2020) and an administrative motion to seal (filed on September 15, 2020). Under the local rules, the four-day time to respond for the first is tomorrow and the second is Monday (because of the intervening weekend). Because the motions seem uncontroversial, the court assumes that the motions will be unopposed but under the circumstances, asks the defendants to file any opposition by tomorrow. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Center -- Corrected (Center, Claudia) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/29/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/22/2020. Replies due by 9/24/2020. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (ejkS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Conference of Bar Examiners (Nugent, Maria) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Conference of Bar Examiners.. (Nugent, Maria) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/29/2020 at 9:30 AM. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 #Electronic filing error re: #12 Notice of Appearance filed by John Doe, Isabel Callejo-Brighton, Kara Gordon. PDF form is incomplete. Please re-file in its entirety. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Isabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Isabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon.. (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State Bar of California.. (Chang, James) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Center (Center, Claudia) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to National Conference of Bar Examiners. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to State Bar of California. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/16/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Isabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jinny Kim In Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Exhibit A Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Kara Gordon's Declaration In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit A Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Kara Gordon's Declaration In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #5 Exhibit B Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Isabel Callejo-Brighton Declaration In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #6 Exhibit B Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Isabel Callejo-Brighton Declaration In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #7 Exhibit C Redacted Version of Exhibit A to John Doe Declaration In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #8 Exhibit C Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to John Doe Declaration In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Isabel Callejo-Brighton, John Doe, Kara Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isabel Callejo-Brighton with Exhibits A and B, #2 Declaration of John Doe with Exhibits A and B, #3 Declaration of Kara Gordon with Exhibits A and B, #4 Declaration of Dr, Julie Graves with Exhibit A, #5 Declaration of Claudia Center with Exhibits A, B, C, and D, #6 Declaration of Peter Blank with Exhibit A, #7 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request for Temporary Retraining Order)(Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Malhar Parimal Shah (Shah, Malhar) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Proceed pseudonymously re #1 Complaint filed by John Doe. Responses due by 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Doe In Support of Administrative Motion for Leave to Proceed Pseudonymously, #2 Proposed Order for Plaintiff John Doe to Proceed Pseudonymously)(Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Bar of California, national Conference of Bar Examiners (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14938341). Filed by Kara Gordon, John Doe, Isabel Callejo-Brighton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kim, Jinny) (Filed on 9/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon et al v. State Bar of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Callejo-Brighton
Represented By: Malhar Parimal Shah
Represented By: Jinny Kim
Represented By: Claudia Center
Represented By: Sydney Rae Pickern
Represented By: Rachael Michelle Langston
Represented By: Nora Kathleen Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Gordon
Represented By: Malhar Parimal Shah
Represented By: Jinny Kim
Represented By: Claudia Center
Represented By: Sydney Rae Pickern
Represented By: Rachael Michelle Langston
Represented By: Nora Kathleen Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Malhar Parimal Shah
Represented By: Jinny Kim
Represented By: Claudia Center
Represented By: Sydney Rae Pickern
Represented By: Rachael Michelle Langston
Represented By: Nora Kathleen Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Conference of Bar Examiners
Represented By: Robert A Burgoyne
Represented By: Maria Anne Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of California
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Kenneth John Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Hershkowitz
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Kenneth John Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?