Abbey v. United States of America, Department of the Navy

Plaintiff: Kevin Abbey, Kim Lewis, Charlie Lyons, A.J. Holder, Tim Anderson, Michael Rebollini, David Maron, Adam Choy, Beaulah Connolly, Matt MacKenzie, Barrett Chan, Roderick Young, Darcy Lee Armanino, Arthur Gabac, Annette Carrier, David Oberhoffer, Winfred Jew, Mark McDonough, Linda Wallace, Carolyn Lundin, Thomas Cunnane, Daniel Greely, Herman Diggs, Mary Hamilton, Mike Hara, Matt Krimsky, William Griffin, Anthony Calasanz, Kimberly Sopp, Heinz Hofmann, Chris daRoza, Jimmy Miranda, Captain Teresa Barrett, Thomas Buckley, Gerald Louie, John Haggett, Concepcion Bertrand, Badge #1651 Joseph Barretta, Dean Taylor, Edward St. Andre, Darlene Martel, Glenn Sylvester, John Haverkamp, Nathan Chan, Quentin Yaranon, Lynette Syme, William Brunicardi, Nicholas Sepich, Benny Fong, Edgar Callejas, George Fogarty, Tarliena Balinton, Stephen Jonas, Melvin Bautista, Michael Jamison, Robert Fung, Alexa Suslow, Susan Fernyak, Kathryn Brown, Ricardo Valdez, Robert Del Torre, Gerald Lyons, Francesca MacKenzie, Sylvia Solomon, Carla Mendoza, Tracy McCray, Michael Hamilton, Kelvin Lai, Neil Cunningham, John Newman, Steven Murphy, Sonia Mariona, Teresa Rubie, Stephen Tacchini, Melvin Thornton, James Dudley, Pamela Hofsass, Richard Lee, Bernadette Castagnola, Bridget Lyons, Gregory Latus, Robert Bohanan, Christopher Olocco, Carlos Recinos, Walter Chan, Pamela Manwiller, Lamar Toney, Thomas Smith, Jr., Michael Browne, Elizabeth-Monica Salazar, Robert Chapman, Robert Johnston, Lawrence Kempinski, Roland Tolosa, John Feeney, Mona Young Jew, Jared Monroe, Brian Devlin, Roberta Friedman, Joe McCloskey, Dan Dudley, Carl Bryant, Richard Alves, Jose Macias, Katherine Honniball, Carla Hurley, Karen Yee, Lindsey Suslow, Dennis Martel, Carl Tennenbaum, Annelyn Ison, Linda Miller, Joseph Zamagni, Jr., John Geraty, Joy Geraty, Mike Burkley, Jesse Robles, Damon Keeve, Tahnee Mehmet, Juanita Stockwell, Brian D'Arcy, Keith Singer, Katharine Cook, Keith Lai, Liza Sung, John Goldberg, Byron Fong, Matthew Castagnola, James Petty, Chris Dunne, Judith Solis, Timothy Tang, Deborah DeFilippo, Ronald Banta, Clifford Cook, Thomas Horan, Sherry Hicks, David Southern, Wendell Jones, Robert Daniele, Officer Vincent Cantillon, Kevin Whalen, Lisa Frazer, Richard Corriea, John Van Koll, Edmund Cota, Roberta Cunningham, Diane Saunders-Sui, Mike Palada, Jan Daniele, Julie Yee, Patricia D'Arcy, Louis Espinda, Sallie Gin, Peter Busalacchi, Leslie Forrestal, Gregory Dito, Robert Leung, Robin Laval, Dori DelCarlo, Nancy Lopez Haggett, Juliana Jamison, Willa Brown, Joseph Carlin, Frederick Smally, Jennifer Williams, Deborah Mcalister, Alex Lozano, Alicia Pashby, Clorinda Springer, Jonathan Fong, Glenn Mori, Carol Slade, Robert Swall, Lawrence Gray, Stephen Hampton, Felix Sung, Julie Centurioni, Ayumi Otome, Christian Newbeck, Annette Van Buskirk, Susan Johnston, Croce Casciato, Brian Canedo, Nida Sylvester, Mary Needham, Kirk Bozin, Penny Schardt, Brian Danker, Katherine Schwarz-Choy, Ann Lai, Franklin Lee, May Lee, Brien Hoo, Manuel Robleto, Al Van Buskirk, Maria Bozin, Niccole Rissetto, Joo-Han Kim, Christopher Hayes, Michelle Walsh, Elizabeth Espinda, Suzette Lee, Thomas Wong, Brett Bodisco, Police Officer Jessie Ortiz, Patrick Paton, David Brandt, Stanley Buscovich, Richard Van Koll, Brian Perry, Erlyn Mambretti, Alisha Williams, Malcolm Anderson, Michele Primiano, Mary Ellen Hofmann, Albert Tong, Moses Gala, Yulanda Williams, Wallace Gin, Jody Kato, James O'Shea, Michael Zurcher, Douglas Farmer, Rosemarie Smith, Pablo Ossio, Michael Niland, Keith Lipp, James Lewis, Adriano Castro, Alan Levy, Michael Toomey, Francis Graves, Kevin Kellogg, Alexandria Brunner-Jones, James Kelly, Sharon Ferrigno, Iraj Mahvi, John Garrity, Mario Molina, Sean Cronin, Patrick Kwan, Ana Morales, Kenneth Koenig, Jordan Hom, Mel Cardenas, David Batchelder, Marty Way, Kimberly Brazill, Edward Yu, Brian Delahunty, Peter Kent De Jesus, Liam Frost, Bart Johnson, Mark Solomon, Denise Christ, Scott Korte, Kristin Coupar, Richard Daniele, Anthony Fotinos, Jason Sawyer, Daniel Rosiak, Shawn Wallace, Arnaldo Aleman, Eugene Kalinin, Roy Priest, Valerie Abbey, Keith Parker, Jahan Kim, Oscar Carcelen, Lawrence Manwiller, Catherine Smally, Dannell Gallegos, E.R. Balinton, Charles Lofgren, Michael Globe, Daniel Shiu, Raquel Williams, David Kucia, Robert Armanino, Michael Griffin, Victoria Dockery, Denis O'Leary, Gary Constantine, Michael Pera, Ben Mcalister, Steven Landi, Steve Roche, Taryn Aguilera, Danny Lopez, Beverly Ann Hall, Wendy Bear, John Ehrlich, Jame Jones, Martin Lalor, Gregory Neal, Edmund Garcia, Bret Grennell, Wayne Smith, Anna Dowke, SFPD#1895 Jesse Serna, Lovely Robinson, Edith Lewis-Luenow, John Fewer, Tim Mayer, Ly Duong, James Cunningham, Kurtis Wong, Mark Potter, Jesusima Yaranon, Rick Bailon, Matthew Mattei, Jay Dowke, Gabriela Keane, Sylvie Tolosa, Kevin Ison, Corazon Lai, Brent Bradford, Adriene Roche, Brendan O'Connor, Jean Buckley, Neil Swendsen, Geoff Bowker, Thomas Walsh, Kevin Chin, Dino Zografos, Carolyn St. Andre, Alejandro Tiffer, Nicholas Allen, Michele Denomie, Marina Cunningham, Larry Chan, Mark Lundin, Debra Anderson, Mary Burns, Linda Delahunty, Jill Legg, Tom Lee, Holly Pera, James Gaan, Cory Blaiss Evans, Carol Margetts, Kevin O'Malley, Edward Ellestad, Richmond Curry, Juliana Garcia, Yan Li, Pierre Martinez, Kelly Wesley, Alexis Goldner, Carolyn Cunningham, Ineke Rush Madsen, Sylvia Morrow, Mimi Wong Haymond, Kevin Dempsey, John Higgins, Richard Tong, Joseph Reilly, Julie Dun, Maureen Hallinan, Leslie Chin, Eddieberto Martinez, Anthony Montoya, John Mambretti, Teresa Ciardella, Alicia Kellogg, Chris Galligan, John Nevin, Wade Bailey, Melissa Benzinger, Karen McDonough, Stephen Tittel, Richard Ernst, Nicole Lama, Vivi Garcia, Herman Jones, Angelita Alves, Barbara Falk, Laura Dito, Alexandra Ramirez, Teresa Daniele, Kathleen Hallin, Rolando Canales, Reno Rapagnani, Eric Quema, Bryan Woo, Michael Connolly, Gerald D'Arcy, Mark Madsen, Michelle Liddicoet, Jared Lovrin, Louis Cassanego, Gary Aicardo, Kevin Murray, Joshua Kumli, Sonny Sarkissian, Angelo Spagnoli, Beverly Chan, Warren Yee, Sandra Fewer, Scott Dumont, Elizabeth Cronin, Philip Pera, John Ramirez, Peter Richardson, Matt Mason, Margie Noli, Michael Becker, Mark Williams, Dennis Schardt, Evelyn Lee, Keith Sanford, Jody Rodriguez, Roger Lu, Henry Shishmanian, Michelle Craig, Bassey Obot, Kim D'Arcy, Craig Farrell and Matthew Valmonte
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Navy
Case Number: 3:2020cv06443
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Filing 99 ORDER. A status conference is set for December 1, 2022, at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. A joint status conference statement is due by November 18, 2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/14/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
October 13, 2022 Filing 98 Letter from Jeffrey D. Dintzer, Alston & Bird LLP, on behalf of the Five Points Parties, Lennar Parties, Abbey Plaintiffs, Pennington Plaintiffs, Carpenter Plaintiffs and Relators . (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 10/13/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 97 ORDER. The motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. 91, is suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing that was set for August 25, 2022, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/22/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
July 26, 2022 Filing 96 REPLY (re #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Amended Complaint ) filed byUnited States of America, Department of the Navy. (Greif, Michele) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 25, 2022 Filing 95 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 27, 2022, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Ana Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, RMR, CRR, CCRR, CRG, CCG, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (165 in 3:20-cv-01485-JD) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2022. (amd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 11, 2022 Filing 94 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Amended Complaint ) - Amended filed byKevin Abbey. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 7/11/2022)
July 6, 2022 Filing 93 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Amended Complaint ) filed byKevin Abbey. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
July 1, 2022 Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Amended Complaint ) filed byKevin Abbey. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
May 27, 2022 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Amended Complaint filed by United States of America, Department of the Navy. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/1/2022. Replies due by 7/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele Greif, #2 Exhibit A - FFA excerpts, #3 Exhibit B - Construction Manual excerpts, #4 Exhibit C - Plan excerpts, #5 Proposed Order)(Greif, Michele) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 3, 2022 Filing 90 Order by Judge James Donato granting as modified #89 Stipulation re Responsive Pleading Briefing. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Responsive Pleading Briefing filed by United States of America, Department of the Navy. (Greif, Michele) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 22, 2022 Filing 88 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES) against United States, United States of America, Department of the Navy. Filed byMark Shea, Charlie Lyons, Richard Corriea, Victor Arrebollo, Marianne Galeano, Samuel Christ, James Hall, Sandra Fewer, David Maron, Gerald Lyons, Wayne Smith, Alicia Pashby, Robert Leung, Patrick Kwan, Mike Burkley, Leslie Forrestal, Francis Graves, Steven Zukor, Juliana Jamison, Yan Li, Keith Lai, Robert Armanino, Sean O'Leary, Aura Horton, Eugene Yoshii, Victoria Dockery, Malcolm Anderson, Sherry Hicks, Helen Jimenez, Dewayne Wilson, Keith Sanford, William Griffin, Juliana Garcia, Brian Delahunty, Niccole Rissetto, Libia Busalacchi, Carolyn Cunningham, Croce Casciato, Philip Brown, Deborah Mcalister, Bridget Lyons, Robert Bonnet, Carla Hurley, Ricardo Valdez, Robert Swall, Michelle Craig, Debbie Fung, Edward Yu, Henry Shishmanian, Jimmy Miranda, Christopher Olocco, Robert Payne, Thomas Haymond, Ayumi Otome, Jame Jones, Robin Laval, Darlene Martel, Alexis Goldner, Daniel Shiu, Neil Cunningham, Ann Lai, Steve Roche, Brian D'Arcy, Melvin Bautista, Michael Favetti, Mark Potter, Mary Ellen Hofmann, Gary Constantine, Kay Stenn, Stephen Mroz, Richard Jones, Raquel Williams, Anna Dowke, Al Van Buskirk, John Ramirez, Lamar Toney, Shirley Sanford, Arnaldo Aleman, Vincent Cantillon, Eddieberto Martinez, Gregory Latus, Jay Dowke, Peter Kozel, Brien Hoo, Mel Cardenas, Francesca MacKenzie, Mark Lundin, Mayra Guerrero, Eugene Kalinin, Lawrence Manwiller, Ronald Banta, William Ahern, Tarliena Balinton, Robert Ford, Mona Young Jew, Don Ciardella, Sylvie Tolosa, John Feeney, Clorinda Springer, Roland Tolosa, Ann Potter, Charles Lofgren, Ineke Rush Madsen, Carlos Recinos, Jesse Serna, Robert Bohanan, Yulanda Williams, Judith Solis, Kenneth Koenig, Juanita Stockwell, Bernadyn Woo Fong, Alan Levy, James Petty, Michelle Liddicoet, Robert Del Torre, Beverly Chan, Jonathan Fong, Linda Miller, Michael Rodriguez, Barrett Chan, Mark Madsen, Roberta Friedman, Kelvin Lai, Willa Brown, Annette Van Buskirk, Matthew Valmonte, Lawrence Gray, James Bosch, Sylvia Morrow, Evelyn Lee, Teresa Barrett, Jody Kato, Nancy Lopez Haggett, Keith Singer, Mario Molina, Judith Riggle, Kevin Abbey, Richmond Curry, Kevin Chin, Dean Taylor, Brian Danker, Annette Carrier, Christopher Hayes, Elizabeth Espinda, Michael Cleary, Carol Finney Mayer, Roberta Cunningham, Tracy McCray, Joseph Robles, Barbara Falk, Jean Buckley, Joy Geraty, Craig Farrell, Sharlene Hom, Joseph Zamagni, Jr., Patricia Priest, Eugene Galeano, Gary Aicardo, E.R. Balinton, Suzette Lee, Angela Wilhelm, Alan McCann, Samantha Mason, Alexa Suslow, Corazon Lai, John Geraty, Rolando Canales, Michael Becker, James O'Shea, Cherie Sakurai, Dean Marcic, Deborah DeFilippo, Alan Honniball, John Peterson, Edward Ellestad, Peter Richardson, James Lewis, Michael Pera, Dennis Meixner, Beaulah Connolly, Dan Laval, Debra Anderson, James Dudley, Taryn Aguilera, Darcy Lee Armanino, Nathan Chan, Stephen Kirwan, Jerome DeFilippo, Ed Wynkoop, Kelvin Sanders, Joshua Kumli, Michael Browne, Jennifer Williams, Stephen Jonas, Darby Reid, Mark Solomon, Kevin Ison, Liam Frost, Julie Yee, Robert Toy, Brendan O'Connor, Brett Bodisco, Roderick Young, Alejandro Tiffer, Pierre Martinez, Joe McCloskey, Stephen Tacchini, Carol Margetts, Susan Johnston, Kevin O'Malley, Susan Fernyak, Carl Bryant, Walter Chan, Daniel Rosiak, Stephen Tittel, Lewis Fong, Jacqueline Lyons, Bret Grennell, Maritza Casciato, Timothy Foley, Kevin Brugaletta, Shawn Wallace, John Garrity, Beverly Ann Hall, James Kelly, Kristin Coupar, Dannell Gallegos, Julie Centurioni, Katharine Cook, Jesse Robles, Kim Lewis, Edna Hoo, Kimberly Brazill, Gail Swall, Stephen Hampton, Daniel Hampton, Jan Daniele, Douglas Farmer, Teresa Daniele, Ana Morales, May Lee, Kelvin Woo, John Ehrlich, Wade Bailey, Lynn Schmidt, Richard Alves, James Guerrero, Thomas Horan, Katherine Honniball, Jerry Salvador, Joseph Carlin, Brent Bradford, Thomas Walsh, Melvin Thornton, Giuseppe Festa, Damon Williams, Catherine Smally, Larry Chan, Patrick Paton, Jill Legg, David Kamita, Denis O'Leary, Scott Korte, Victor Tsang, Angelo Spagnoli, Michael Griffin, Richard Daniele, Chris Galligan, Herman Jones, Roger Battaglia, Sharon Ford, Sherrill Quartini-Huddleston, Kathleen Knopp-Garcia, Wendy Bear, Carl Tennenbaum, John Higgins, Michael Slade, Mark McDonough, Sean McEllistrim, Alma Landi, Ly Duong, James Ramsey, Frederick Smally, Diane O'Leary, Thomas Wong, Alisha Williams, Roy Heavey, Laura Dito, Rosalind Reid, Roger Peters, Glenn Mori, Kristi Woo, Michael Jamison, David Smith, Patricia D'Arcy, Keith Lipp, Maria Bozin, Michael Huddleston, Edmund Cota, Kevin Kellogg, Larryett Anderson, Benny Fong, Steve Glickman, Michael Hamilton, Peter Kent De Jesus, Sean Cronin, John Denny, Patricia Linehan, Stephen Benzinger, Katherine Schwarz-Choy, Glenn Ortega, Sonia Mariona, Tami Celaya, Patricia Burley, Kimberly Sopp, John Newman, John Van Koll, Takako Swendsen, Karen McDonough, Peter Busalacchi, Louis Cassanego, Carolyn Lundin, Penny Schardt, Mary Frost, Damon Keeve, Roger Lu, Richard Van Koll, Glenn Sylvester, Alicia Kellogg, Donald Bickel, Teresa Ciardella, Andrew Kofman, Matt Mason, Trenia Wearing, Scott Dumont, Bassey Obot, Wendell Jones, Michael Robinson, Martha Fabiani, Estela Martinez Cuevas, Bart Johnson, Melinda Kalinin, Joseph Garbayo, Mimi Wong Haymond, Edgar Callejas, Edward St. Andre, Robert Totah, Mary Hamilton, Noreen Hughes, Teresa Rubie, Robert Chapman, Reno Rapagnani, Mary Needham, David Brandt, Stephen Murphy, Brian Boyd, Sylvia Solomon, Kenwade Lee, Robert Fung, Gerald Newbeck, John Mambretti, Michele Denomie, Alexandra Medina, John Miller, Jessie Ortiz, Vivi Garcia, James Gaan, Pamela Fitzgerald-Wermes, Lindsey Suslow, Rosemarie Smith, Heinz Hofmann, Brian Perry, Marilyn Bisordi, Joseph Allegro, Angelita Alves, Kim D'Arcy, Melissa Benzinger, Adriano Castro, George Cuevas, Sharon Ferrigno, Bryan Woo, Ryan Jensen, Kevin Dempsey, Pamela Hofsass, Karen Yee, David Dockery, Gerald Schmidt, Michael Niland, Dennis Schardt, Michael Keane, Michelle Walsh, Nida Sylvester, David Batchelder, Dan Linehan, Jose Macias, Matt Krimsky, Richard Lee, Anthony Fotinos, Mark Mahoney, Pamela Manwiller, Robert Duffield, Gordon Yee, Yvonne Hampton, Barbara Brewster, Michael Toomey, Winfred Jew, Bonnie Cheng, Jahan Kim, Franklin Lee, Matthew Castagnola, Anna Teresa Allen, Alex Lozano, Ben Mcalister, Steven Redd, Gabriela Keane, Christalyn Washington, Stanley Buscovich, Quentin Yaranon, Anthony Montoya, John Evans, Wallace Gin, Jesusima Yaranon, Johnny Velasquez, John Syme, Oscar Carcelen, Marcella Mastro, Rick Bailon, Marcie Mori, Jerrell Bell, Anthony Crosley, Cezar Perez, Dana Jonas, Steven Murphy, Kirk Bozin, Byron Fong, John Nevin, Daniel Greely, Nicholas Allen, Alexandra Ramirez, David Southern, Thomas Buckley, Mathew Pashby, Warren Yee, Leroy Lindo, Tahnee Mehmet, Theresa Rosiak, Timothy Tang, Pablo Ossio, Dori DelCarlo, John Goldberg, Maureen Hallinan, Mike Hara, Jared Monroe, Davin Cole, Robert Daniele, Marty Way, Gregory Dito, Joseph Barretta, Valerie Abbey, John Fewer, Margie Noli, Linda Zamagni, Carla Mendoza, Christian Newbeck, Liza Sung, Thomas Cunnane, Cynthia Cleary, Kimberly Wong, Lynette Syme, Clifford Cook, John Barcojo, David Kucia, Nicholas Sepich, Linda Delahunty, Philip Pera, Kurtis Wong, Lawrence Kempinski, Joseph Fong, Lamont Suslow, Dan Sui, Brian Canedo, Jody Rodriguez, Leanna Dawydiak, Lillian Velasquez, Scott Hurley, Iraj Mahvi, Marina Cunningham, Gary Jimenez, John Centurioni, Thomas King, Jose Robles, Herman Diggs, John Haverkamp, Kevin Needham, Lance Bosshard, Arthur Gabac, Lovely Robinson, Jessica Hampton, Bernadette Castagnola, Kevin Murray, Alexandria Brunner-Jones, Martin Lalor, Neil Swendsen, Brandon Thompson, Mary Burns, Sid Sakurai, Elizabeth Cronin, Rob Ziegler, Moses Gala, Donna Meixner, Lorraine Fong, Chris Dunne, Danny Lopez, Maria Corriea, George Fogarty, Dyanna Lee-Louie, Mark Williams, Keith Parker, Chris daRoza, Dino Zografos, Alan Hom, Robert Guillermo, Allyn Luenow, Joseph Reilly, Diane Saunders-Sui, Richard Ernst, Thomas Smith, Jr., Marlita Pera, Nicole Greely, Jared Lovrin, Denise Christ, Jordan Hom, Alberto Miranda, William Coggan, Dennis Martel, Robert Johnston, Tim Mayer, Michele Primiano, Michael Rebollini, David Oberhoffer, Edmund Garcia, Bruce Ferrigno, Erik Whitney, Mike Palada, Michael Globe, Adam Choy, Marquita Booth, William Brunicardi, Richard Parry, Tom Faye, Tim Oberzeir, Felix Sung, Joel Harms, Michael Zurcher, Anthony Calasanz, Elizabeth-Monica Salazar, Paul Swiatko, Erlyn Mambretti, Sallie Gin, Michael Hughes, Jason Sawyer, Gregory Neal, Edgar Springer, John Mino, Roy Priest, Brian Nannery, John Haggett, Andrea Joseph, Kelly Wesley, Dan Cunningham, Sonia Cole, Dustin Daza, Michael Connolly, Nicole Lama, Henry Garcia, Angee Cordero, Louis Espinda, Geoff Bowker, Larry Bertrand, Manuel Robleto, Tom Lee, Albert Tong, Nelson Lum, Matt MacKenzie, Annelyn Ison, Richard Tong, Dan Dudley, Joo-Han Kim, Chris Damonte, Tim Anderson, Joann Cunnane, Holly Pera, Roberto Salinas, Frances Williams, Brian Devlin, James Cunningham, Kathryn Brown, John Bisordi, Sonny Sarkissian, Kevin Whalen, Steven Landi, Daniel Manning, Matthew Mattei, Cory Blaiss Evans, Carol Slade, Carolyn St. Andre, Concepcion Bertrand, Julie Petty, Anthony Gomes, William Kraus, Katherine Portoni, Edith Lewis-Luenow, Eric Quema, Mari Shepard, Dominic Celaya, A.J. Holder, Julian Ng, Linda Wallace, Adriene Roche, Timothy Flaherty, Kathleen Hallin, Gerald D'Arcy, Evelyn Bell, Gerald Louie, Leslie Chin, Julie Dun, Lisa Frazer. (Ganci, Kelly) (Filed on 4/22/2022) Modified on 4/22/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2022 Filing 87 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/23/2022. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
December 20, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE by United States Statement of Recent Decision Pursuant to Local Rule 7.3(d)(2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Esquivel v. United States, No. 20-35868)(Pilgrim, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
November 1, 2021 Filing 85 ORDER. The motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. 69, is suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing that was set for November 4, 2021, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/1/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 84 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/14/2021 before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Ana Dub, RDR, RMR, CRR, CSR No. 7445, telephone number 415-290-1651/ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (212 in 3:18-cv-05330-JD) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2022. (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Alexander Pilgrim on behalf of the United States (Pilgrim, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemary C. Yogiaveetil on behalf of the United States (Yogiaveetil, Rosemary) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 81 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing continued to 11/4/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (Related documents(s) #69 )(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE by United States of America, Department of the Navy Withdrawal of Individual Counsel (Patton, Lorren) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 79 REPLY (re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byUnited States of America, Department of the Navy. (Greif, Michele) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement working group meeting held on 8/31/2021 by Zoom.Liberty Recording Time: Not Recorded For Abbey Plaintiffs: Khaldoun Baghdadi and Sara PetersFor Pennington Plaintiffs: Anne Marie Murphy and Donald MagilliganFor BayView Resident Plaintiffs: Cabral BonnarFor USA Plaintiff: Robert Chandler and Michael PyleFor USA Defendant: Michele Greif and Adam BainFor TetraTech Defendants: Davina Pujari and Chris RheinheimerFor Five Point: Jeffrey Dintzer and Matt WickershamFor Lennar: Madhu Pocha and Geoff YostFor CHM2Hill Defendants: Blanca YoungFor Relator Plaintiffs: David Anton (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/31/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE filed by Kevin Abbey of Notice of Withdrawal of Jade Smith-Williams as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 76 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Plaintiffs' Amended Opposition to United States' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed byKevin Abbey, Valerie Abbey, Taryn Aguilera, William Ahern, Gary Aicardo, Arnaldo Aleman, Joseph Allegro, Anna Teresa Allen, Nicholas Allen, Angelita Alves, Richard Alves, Debra Anderson, Larryett Anderson, Malcolm Anderson, Tim Anderson, Darcy Lee Armanino, Robert Armanino, Victor Arrebollo, Wade Bailey, Rick Bailon, E.R. Balinton, Tarliena Balinton, Ronald Banta, John Barcojo, Teresa Barrett, Joseph Barretta, David Batchelder, Roger Battaglia, Melvin Bautista, Wendy Bear, Michael Becker, Evelyn Bell, Jerrell Bell, Melissa Benzinger, Stephen Benzinger, Concepcion Bertrand, Larry Bertrand, Donald Bickel, John Bisordi, Marilyn Bisordi, Brett Bodisco, Robert Bohanan, Robert Bonnet, Marquita Booth, James Bosch, Lance Bosshard, Geoff Bowker, Brian Boyd, Kirk Bozin, Maria Bozin, Brent Bradford, David Brandt, Kimberly Brazill, Barbara Brewster, Kathryn Brown, Philip Brown, Willa Brown, Michael Browne, Kevin Brugaletta, William Brunicardi, Alexandria Brunner-Jones, Carl Bryant, Jean Buckley, Thomas Buckley, Mike Burkley, Patricia Burley, Mary Burns, Libia Busalacchi, Peter Busalacchi, Stanley Buscovich, Anthony Calasanz, Edgar Callejas, Rolando Canales, Brian Canedo, Vincent Cantillon, Oscar Carcelen, Mel Cardenas, Joseph Carlin, Annette Carrier, Croce Casciato, Maritza Casciato, Louis Cassanego, Bernadette Castagnola, Matthew Castagnola, Adriano Castro, Dominic Celaya, Tami Celaya, John Centurioni, Julie Centurioni, Barrett Chan, Beverly Chan, Larry Chan, Nathan Chan, Walter Chan, Robert Chapman, Bonnie Cheng, Kevin Chin, Leslie Chin, Adam Choy, Denise Christ, Samuel Christ, Don Ciardella, Teresa Ciardella, Cynthia Cleary, Michael Cleary, William Coggan, Davin Cole, Sonia Cole, Beaulah Connolly, Michael Connolly, Gary Constantine, Clifford Cook, Katharine Cook, Angee Cordero, Maria Corriea, Richard Corriea, Edmund Cota, Kristin Coupar, Michelle Craig, Elizabeth Cronin, Sean Cronin, Anthony Crosley, Estela Martinez Cuevas, George Cuevas, Joann Cunnane, Thomas Cunnane, Carolyn Cunningham, Dan Cunningham, James Cunningham, Marina Cunningham, Neil Cunningham, Roberta Cunningham, Richmond Curry, Brian D'Arcy, Gerald D'Arcy, Kim D'Arcy, Patricia D'Arcy, Chris Damonte, Jan Daniele, Richard Daniele, Robert Daniele, Teresa Daniele, Brian Danker, Leanna Dawydiak, Dustin Daza, Peter Kent De Jesus, Deborah DeFilippo, Jerome DeFilippo, Robert Del Torre, Dori DelCarlo, Brian Delahunty, Linda Delahunty, Kevin Dempsey, John Denny, Michele Denomie, Brian Devlin, Herman Diggs, Gregory Dito, Laura Dito, David Dockery, Victoria Dockery, Anna Dowke, Jay Dowke, Dan Dudley, James Dudley, Robert Duffield, Scott Dumont, Julie Dun, Chris Dunne, Ly Duong, John Ehrlich, Edward Ellestad, Richard Ernst, Elizabeth Espinda, Louis Espinda, Cory Blaiss Evans, John Evans, Martha Fabiani, Barbara Falk, Douglas Farmer, Craig Farrell, Michael Favetti, Tom Faye, John Feeney, Susan Fernyak, Bruce Ferrigno, Sharon Ferrigno, Giuseppe Festa, John Fewer, Sandra Fewer, Pamela Fitzgerald-Wermes, Timothy Flaherty, George Fogarty, Timothy Foley, Benny Fong, Bernadyn Woo Fong, Byron Fong, Jonathan Fong, Joseph Fong, Lewis Fong, Lorraine Fong, Robert Ford, Sharon Ford, Leslie Forrestal, Anthony Fotinos, Lisa Frazer, Roberta Friedman, Liam Frost, Mary Frost, Debbie Fung, Robert Fung, James Gaan, Arthur Gabac, Moses Gala, Eugene Galeano, Marianne Galeano, Dannell Gallegos, Chris Galligan, Joseph Garbayo, Edmund Garcia, Henry Garcia, Juliana Garcia, Vivi Garcia, John Garrity, John Geraty, Joy Geraty, Sallie Gin, Wallace Gin, Steve Glickman, Michael Globe, John Goldberg, Alexis Goldner, Anthony Gomes, Francis Graves, Lawrence Gray, Daniel Greely, Nicole Greely, Bret Grennell, Michael Griffin, William Griffin, James Guerrero, Mayra Guerrero, Robert Guillermo, John Haggett, Nancy Lopez Haggett, Beverly Ann Hall, James Hall, Kathleen Hallin, Maureen Hallinan, Mary Hamilton, Michael Hamilton, Daniel Hampton, Jessica Hampton, Stephen Hampton, Yvonne Hampton, Mike Hara, Joel Harms, John Haverkamp, Christopher Hayes, Mimi Wong Haymond, Thomas Haymond, Roy Heavey, Sherry Hicks, John Higgins, Heinz Hofmann, Mary Ellen Hofmann, Pamela Hofsass, A.J. Holder, Alan Hom, Jordan Hom, Sharlene Hom, Alan Honniball, Katherine Honniball, Brien Hoo, Edna Hoo, Thomas Horan, Aura Horton, Michael Huddleston, Michael Hughes, Noreen Hughes, Carla Hurley, Scott Hurley, Annelyn Ison, Kevin Ison, Juliana Jamison, Michael Jamison, Ryan Jensen, Mona Young Jew, Winfred Jew, Gary Jimenez, Helen Jimenez, Bart Johnson, Robert Johnston, Susan Johnston, Dana Jonas, Stephen Jonas, Herman Jones, Jame Jones, Richard Jones, Wendell Jones, Andrea Joseph, Eugene Kalinin, Melinda Kalinin, David Kamita, Jody Kato, Gabriela Keane, Michael Keane, Damon Keeve, Alicia Kellogg, Kevin Kellogg, James Kelly, Lawrence Kempinski, Jahan Kim, Joo-Han Kim, Thomas King, Stephen Kirwan, Kathleen Knopp-Garcia, Kenneth Koenig, Andrew Kofman, Scott Korte, Peter Kozel, William Kraus, Matt Krimsky, David Kucia, Joshua Kumli, Patrick Kwan, Ann Lai, Corazon Lai, Keith Lai, Kelvin Lai, Martin Lalor, Nicole Lama, Alma Landi, Steven Landi, Gregory Latus, Dan Laval, Robin Laval, Evelyn Lee, Franklin Lee, Kenwade Lee, May Lee, Richard Lee, Suzette Lee, Tom Lee, Dyanna Lee-Louie, Jill Legg, Robert Leung, Alan Levy, James Lewis, Kim Lewis, Edith Lewis-Luenow, Yan Li, Michelle Liddicoet, Leroy Lindo, Dan Linehan, Patricia Linehan, Keith Lipp, Charles Lofgren, Danny Lopez, Gerald Louie, Jared Lovrin, Alex Lozano, Roger Lu, Allyn Luenow, Nelson Lum, Carolyn Lundin, Mark Lundin, Bridget Lyons, Charlie Lyons, Gerald Lyons, Jacqueline Lyons, Francesca MacKenzie, Matt MacKenzie, Jose Macias, Ineke Rush Madsen, Mark Madsen, Mark Mahoney, Iraj Mahvi, Erlyn Mambretti, John Mambretti, Daniel Manning, Lawrence Manwiller, Pamela Manwiller, Dean Marcic, Carol Margetts, Sonia Mariona, David Maron, Darlene Martel, Dennis Martel, Eddieberto Martinez, Pierre Martinez, Matt Mason, Samantha Mason, Marcella Mastro, Matthew Mattei, Carol Finney Mayer, Tim Mayer, Alan McCann, Joe McCloskey, Tracy McCray, Karen McDonough, Mark McDonough, Sean McEllistrim, Ben Mcalister, Deborah Mcalister, Alexandra Medina, Tahnee Mehmet, Dennis Meixner, Donna Meixner, Carla Mendoza, John Miller, Linda Miller, John Mino, Alberto Miranda, Jimmy Miranda, Mario Molina, Jared Monroe, Anthony Montoya, Ana Morales, Glenn Mori, Marcie Mori, Sylvia Morrow, Stephen Mroz, Stephen Murphy, Steven Murphy, Kevin Murray, Brian Nannery, Gregory Neal, Kevin Needham, Mary Needham, John Nevin, Christian Newbeck, Gerald Newbeck, John Newman, Julian Ng, Michael Niland, Margie Noli, Brendan O'Connor, Denis O'Leary, Diane O'Leary, Sean O'Leary, Kevin O'Malley, James O'Shea, David Oberhoffer, Tim Oberzeir, Bassey Obot, Christopher Olocco, Glenn Ortega, Jessie Ortiz, Pablo Ossio, Ayumi Otome, Mike Palada, Keith Parker, Richard Parry, Alicia Pashby, Mathew Pashby, Patrick Paton, Robert Payne, Holly Pera, Marlita Pera, Michael Pera, Philip Pera, Cezar Perez, Brian Perry, Roger Peters, John Peterson, James Petty, Julie Petty, Katherine Portoni, Ann Potter, Mark Potter, Patricia Priest, Roy Priest, Michele Primiano, Sherrill Quartini-Huddleston, Eric Quema, Alexandra Ramirez, John Ramirez, James Ramsey, Reno Rapagnani, Michael Rebollini, Carlos Recinos, Steven Redd, Darby Reid, Rosalind Reid, Joseph Reilly, Peter Richardson, Judith Riggle, Niccole Rissetto, Lovely Robinson, Michael Robinson, Jesse Robles, Jose Robles, Joseph Robles, Manuel Robleto, Adriene Roche, Steve Roche, Jody Rodriguez, Michael Rodriguez, Daniel Rosiak, Theresa Rosiak, Teresa Rubie, Cherie Sakurai, Sid Sakurai, Elizabeth-Monica Salazar, Roberto Salinas, Jerry Salvador, Kelvin Sanders, Keith Sanford, Shirley Sanford, Sonny Sarkissian, Diane Saunders-Sui, Jason Sawyer, Dennis Schardt, Penny Schardt, Gerald Schmidt, Lynn Schmidt, Katherine Schwarz-Choy, Nicholas Sepich, Jesse Serna, Mark Shea, Mari Shepard, Henry Shishmanian, Daniel Shiu, Keith Singer, Carol Slade, Michael Slade, Catherine Smally, Frederick Smally, David Smith, Rosemarie Smith, Wayne Smith, Thomas Smith, Jr., Judith Solis, Mark Solomon, Sylvia Solomon, Kimberly Sopp, David Southern, Angelo Spagnoli, Clorinda Springer, Edgar Springer, Carolyn St. Andre, Edward St. Andre, Kay Stenn, Juanita Stockwell, Dan Sui, Felix Sung, Liza Sung, Alexa Suslow, Lamont Suslow, Lindsey Suslow, Gail Swall, Robert Swall, Neil Swendsen, Takako Swendsen, Paul Swiatko, Glenn Sylvester, Nida Sylvester, John Syme, Lynette Syme, Stephen Tacchini, Timothy Tang, Dean Taylor, Carl Tennenbaum, Brandon Thompson, Melvin Thornton, Alejandro Tiffer, Stephen Tittel, Roland Tolosa, Sylvie Tolosa, Lamar Toney, Albert Tong, Richard Tong, Michael Toomey, Robert Totah, Robert Toy, Victor Tsang, Ricardo Valdez, Matthew Valmonte, Al Van Buskirk, Annette Van Buskirk, John Van Koll, Richard Van Koll, Johnny Velasquez, Lillian Velasquez, Linda Wallace, Shawn Wallace, Michelle Walsh, Thomas Walsh, Christalyn Washington, Marty Way, Trenia Wearing, Kelly Wesley, Kevin Whalen, Erik Whitney, Angela Wilhelm, Alisha Williams, Damon Williams, Frances Williams, Jennifer Williams, Mark Williams, Raquel Williams, Yulanda Williams, Dewayne Wilson, Kimberly Wong, Kurtis Wong, Thomas Wong, Bryan Woo, Kelvin Woo, Kristi Woo, Ed Wynkoop, Jesusima Yaranon, Quentin Yaranon, Gordon Yee, Julie Yee, Karen Yee, Warren Yee, Eugene Yoshii, Roderick Young, Edward Yu, Linda Zamagni, Joseph Zamagni, Jr., Rob Ziegler, Dino Zografos, Steven Zukor, Michael Zurcher, Chris daRoza. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 75 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byKevin Abbey. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 74 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A settlement conference is scheduled for August 31, 2021 at 10:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu by Zoom videoconference. Judge Ryu will conduct the Zoom meeting in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 73 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/15/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/17/2021 before Judge James Donato by United States of America, Department of the Navy, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Greif, Michele) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 29, 2021 Filing 71 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/17/21, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, \Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (179 in 3:18-cv-05330-JD) Transcript Order, (85 in 3:20-cv-01480-JD) Transcript Order, (113 in 3:20-cv-01485-JD) Transcript Order, (181 in 3:18-cv-05330-JD) Transcript Order, (178 in 3:18-cv-05330-JD) Transcript Order, (180 in 3:18-cv-05330-JD) Transcript Order,, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2021. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 29, 2021 Filing 70 ORDER. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/29/2021. The 7/7/21 subgroup 2 mediation session is vacated. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by United States of America, Department of the Navy. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/5/2021. Replies due by 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence Lansdale, #2 Declaration of Michele Greif, #3 Exhibit 1 - Contract Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 2 - 1995 BRIM Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 3 - 1996 Bldg 606 EBS Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 4 - 1996 Bldg 606 FOSL, #7 Exhibit 5 - 1994 Hunters Point MOU, #8 Exhibit 6 - DON BRAC Impl Guidance Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 7 - Fnl Comm Involv Plan Update Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 8 - SECNAVINST 5720.44C Excerpts, #11 Exhibit 9 - 1997 BRIM Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 10 - 2006 BRRM Excerpts, #13 [Proposed] Order)(Greif, Michele) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 18, 2021 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 6/17/2021. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE. The status conference is re-set for 1:00 p.m. on June 17, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 66 ORDER. The Court sets a status conference for June 17, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. to discuss the discovery repository and any related issues. The conference will be held by remote access. Each party or party group should designate a lead counsel to speak at the conference by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by June 15, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/3/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorren Patton (Patton, Lorren) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 64 Order by Judge James Donato granting #62 Stipulation re Responsive Pleading Briefing. At the joint request of the parties, the United States will submit its motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs in 20-cv-06443-JD on or before June 21, 2021; plaintiffs will have 45 days to submit an opposition; and the United States will have 30 days to submit a reply. The United States' motion to dismiss is limited to 20 pages; plaintiffs' opposition is limited to 20 pages; and the United States' reply is limited to 15 pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 27, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Wells Stanton (Stanton, Caroline) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 62 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Responsive Pleading Briefing filed by United States. (Greif, Michele) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further session with Subgroup 3 held on 5/26/2021 by Zoom. Results: The parties will continue to meet and confer as discussed and will provide a further joint status letter to Judge Ryu by 6/30/2021.FTR Time: Not RecordedFor CPHP: Madhu Pocha For Five Point: Jeffrey Dintzer and Matthew WickershamFor Tetra Tech: Chris Rheinheimer and Mert Howard (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/26/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further session with Subgroup 4 held on 5/25/2021 by Zoom. Results: No appearance by Mr. Anton. USA as Plaintiff and Tetra Tech will continue to meet and confer as discussed. They shall provide an updated status letter to Judge Ryu by 7/9/2021.FTR Time: Not RecordedFor USA as Plaintiff: Rob Chandler and Michael PyleFor Tetra Tech: Davina Pujari and Mert Howard (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/25/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Bain for the United States (Bain, Adam) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 58 STIPULATED ORDER RE ESI PROTOCOL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/20/2021. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement discovery planning session held on 5/14/2021. Court Reporter: Not reported. For USA (Plaintiff): Rob Chandler, Patrick Klein. For USA (Defendant): Michelle Greif, Adam Bain. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele Greif (Greif, Michele) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE: On 5/14/2021 10:00 AM Pacific Time in Oakland, - Videoconference Only, Judge Ryu will convene a 30-minute Zoom meeting solely with the lawyers for USA as Plaintiff and USA as Defendant to discuss the government's production of documents as part of the settlement planning process. Judge Ryu will conduct the Zoom meeting in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Mediation session held on 4/26/2021 by Zoom with Subgroup 4 regarding key documents needed for meaningful settlement.Results: By 5/5/2021, Tetra Tech and Relators will reduce their agreements to writing. By 5/5/2021, USA will respond in writing regarding its willingness to further explain the sources of information underlying its allegations, with a copy to Judge Ryu. The Subgroup 4 lawyers shall engage in further detailed meet and confer sessions regarding all outstanding requests between Tetra Tech and the USA as Plaintiff except for TT 19-21, as discussed in today's session. They shall file a further joint letter by 5/12/2021. Judge Ryu will convene a further mediation session with Subgroup 4 for up to 1.5 hours via Zoom on 5/25/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Judge Ryu will conduct the further mediation session in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 FTR Time: Not Recorded For United States: Rob Chandler and Michael PyleFor Tetra Tech: Davina Pujari and Chris RheinheimerFor Relators: David Anton (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Mediation session held on 4/26/2021 by Zoom with Subgroup 3 regarding key documents needed for meaningful settlement. Results: The Subgroup 3 parties shall continue to meet and confer regarding Tetra Tech's requests to the builders (TT 24 30). They shall send Judge Ryu an updated joint letter by 5/10/21. Judge Ryu will convene a further mediation session with Subgroup 3 for up to 1.5 hours via Zoom on 5/26/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only.Judge Ryu will conduct the further mediation session in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361FTR Time: Not RecordedFor Tetra Tech: Chris Rheinheimer and Mert HowardFor Five Point: Jeffrey Dintzer and Matt WickershamFor Lennar: Madhu Pocha and Geoff Yost (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Mediation session held on 4/23/2021 by Zoom with Subgroup 2 regarding key documents needed for meaningful settlement discussions. Results: Re TT 38-39: TetraTech and Pennington Plaintiffs will continue to meet and confer. Re PL 11-16, Bayview Plaintiffs will provide narrowed requests to Tetra Tech by 5/7/2021. Re PL 3-4, Tetra Tech will provide Subgroup 2 Plaintiffs with a proposed scope and timeline for production by 4/30/2021. Re PL 5 and PL 23: Pennington Plaintiffs will provide Tetra Tech with suggested keywords (PL 5) and narrowed request (PL 23) by 5/7/2021. Re PL 22: Tetra Tech will provide Subgroup 2 Plaintiffs with an update by 5/21/2021. Re PL 27: Judge Ryu will post a separate order scheduling a meeting and requesting a status report from the coordination committee about their efforts regarding core documents from 2000 forward. The Abbey Plaintiffs shall now join the coordination committee for the purpose of discussing core documents predating 2000. Re PL 29-31: TetraTech will provide Subgroup 2 Plaintiffs with an update by 5/21/2021.By 7/1/2021, Subgroup 2 shall provide Judge Ryu with an updated joint status letter that sets forth the parties' agreements and provides their positions on any remaining disputes. Judge Ryu will convene a further 1 hour mediation session by Zoom with Subgroup 2 on 7/7/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only if there are any remaining disputes. Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 FTR Time: Not Recorded For Abbey Plaintiffs: Sara Peters and Khaldoun Baghdadi For Pennington Plaintiffs: Anne Marie Murphy and Donald MagilliganFor Bayview Resident Plaintiffs: Charles Bonnar and Cabral BonnarFor Tetra Tech: Chris Rheinheimer and Mert Howard (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2021).
April 23, 2021 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Mediation session held on 4/23/2021 by Zoom with Subgroup 1 regarding key documents needed for meaningful settlement discussions.Results: As a next step, Judge Ryu will convene a separate session with attorneys for USA as Plaintiff and USA as Defendant. FTR Time: Not ReportedFor Abbey Plaintiffs: Khaldoun Baghdadi and Sara PetersFor Pennington Plaintiffs: Anne Marie MurphyFor USA Defendant: Michele Greif and Adam BainFor Bayview Residents: Charles Bonnar and Cabral BonnarFor Five Point: Jeffrey Dintzer and Matt WickershamFor Lennar: Madhu Pocha and Geoff Yost (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2021).
April 20, 2021 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Abbey re #47 Summons Issued (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 49 ORDER re #42 motion to enlarge time. The Court accepts plaintiffs' explanation about service. Plaintiffs are directed to effect service on the Navy by May 17, 2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/14/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Abbey re #47 Summons Issued (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 47 Summons Issued as to United States of America, Department of the Navy, United States Attorney's Office, Attorney General of the United States. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 46 Proposed Summons. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 45 Proposed Summons. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 44 Proposed Summons. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 43 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kevin Abbey as to All Plaintiffs. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE ON THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY filed by Kevin Abbey. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/23/2021. Replies due by 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Peters, Sara) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 2, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Summons issued 9/15/2021 at docket #7 must be returned unexecuted before new summons will be issued. [err103]This filing will not be proc essed by the clerks office. Re: #40 Proposed Summons filed by Kevin Abbey (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE EARLY DOCUMENT PRODUCTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/1/2021. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 40 Proposed Summons. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
March 25, 2021 Filing 39 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EARLY DOCUMENT PRODUCTIONS filed by Tetra Tech Inc.. (Rheinheimer, Christopher) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME: Following the settlement working group meeting on 2/16/2021, the court posted a minute order stating that, under the lead of Mr. Rheinheimer, [t]he working group shall file the stipulation and proposed order (regarding production of certain agreed-upon documents) by 3/18/2021. Mr. Rheinheimer has requested an extension to 3/25/2021, which the court now grants. The court expects all participants to plan for and cooperate in preparing the stipulation and proposed order so that each participant has adequate time to respond to proposed edits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/17/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 15, 2021 Filing 37 ORDER SETTING SUB-GROUP MEDIATION SESSIONS: Sub-group mediation sessions set for 4/23/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only; 4/23/2021 03:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only; 4/26/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only; and 4/26/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (See Order for all particulars).Judge Ryu will conduct the sub-group mediation sessions in her non-public Zoom meeting room, the link for which is available on her webpage and is listed here for the parties' convenience: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09Meeting ID: 161 949 4731Passcode: 030361 Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/15/21. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 16, 2021 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement working group meeting held via Zoom on 2/16/2021. Results: Mr. Rheinheimer agreed to take the lead on circulating a stipulation and proposed order with protocols for production of the agreed-upon documents set forth in pages 2-5 of the 2/9/2021 chart submitted to Judge Ryu. To the extent possible, the stipulation shall include any agreements on coordinated production (see below) with respect to this group of documents. The working group shall file the stipulation and proposed order by 3/18/2021. By 2/23/2021, Mr. Baghdadi shall submit a letter to Judge Ryu on behalf of the working group that identifies the sub-groups that will meet and confer on disputes outlined in pages 6-30 of the 2/9/2021 chart. The sub-groups shall immediately engage in meet and confer sessions. Judge Ryu expects to schedule 60-90 minute mediation sessions with the sub-groups, starting in 45-60 days. The sub-groups have agreed to make best efforts to eliminate or at least narrow their disputes. At least 48 business hours before a sub-group session with Judge Ryu, counsel will provide Judge Ryu with a two-page joint letter that sets forth the remaining disputes along with a summary of the parties' positions. The working group will also sponsor a coordination committee, which will create a protocol for identification and production of "official" core documents in order to eliminate duplication, inefficiencies, and authentication issues. The work of this committee will begin with counsel for TetraTech and the USA (both as Plaintiff and Defendant), as these parties are the sources of many of the core documents. Committee membership will later expand to include Plaintiffs' counsel in the Abbey litigation.FTR Time: Not RecordedFor TetraTech Defendants: Davina Pujari; Mert Howard; and Chris RheinheimerFor Abbey Plaintiffs: Khaldoun Baghdadi and Sara PetersFor Pennington Plaintiffs: Anne Marie Murphy and Donald MagilliganFor USA Plaintiff: Robert Chandler and Michael PyleFor USA Defendant: Michele Greif and Adam BainFor Five Point: Jeffrey Dintzer and Matt WickershamFor Lennar: Madhu Pocha and Megan Havstad (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2021)
December 11, 2020 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial settlement working group meeting held on 12/11/2020 by Zoom. Results: The work of this group covers all related cases that involve Hunters Point Naval Shipyard, except that Defendants in Case No. 20-4704 JD are exempt from participation until further notice by Judge Ryu. The discussions in the working group sessions are confidential settlement communications. However, the working group members shall share the communications with other counsel who are not part of the working group, as well as clients of working group and non-working group members, all of whom must be told to maintain the confidentiality of the communications. Ms. Pujari agreed to promptly circulate the early-2020 list of approximately 11 core categories of documents to all counsel and Judge Ryu. By 1/12/2021, each party in the related HPNS cases (except 20-4704) shall identify the categories of liability-related documents and the rulings that the party represents to the court as necessary to engaging in meaningful settlement discussions. The categories shall be drafted in the style of specific and narrowly tailored requests for production. As discussed in todays session, the working group members will then engage in a meet and confer process that loops in other parties who are not directly represented in the working group in order to reach agreement on specific categories of liability-related documents. The meet and confer process must be completed by 1/29/2021. By 2/9/2021, the two sections of the working group identified in today's meeting will submit (1) a joint list of agreed categories; and (2) a joint list of disputed categories in table form that sets forth each disputed category and the part(ies) who identified the category as necessary. By 2/9/2021, the two sections shall each submit a 5-page letter to Judge Ryu setting forth their positions on each disputed category. The 2/9/2021 submissions shall be sent to Judge Ryu (DMRsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov), as well as counsel for all parties who participated in the identification of document categories. Judge Ryu will host a further session of the working group on 2/16/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only for approximately 2 2.5 hours.The session will be held in Judge Ryu's non-public Zoom meeting room: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361The Zoom Meeting link is also available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr FTR Time: Not RecordedFor TetraTech Defendants: Davina Pujari and Mert HowardFor Abbey Plaintiffs:Khaldoun Baghdadi For Pennington Plaintiffs: Anne Marie Murphy and Donald MagilliganFor USA Plaintiff: Robert Chandler and Michael PyleFor USA Defendant: Michele Greif and Adam BainFor Five Point: Jeffrey Dintzer and Matt WickershamFor Lennar: Madhu Pocha and Megan Havstad (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/11/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 34 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PLANNING SESSION: Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will host a settlement conference planning session on 12/11/2020 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. The session will take approximately 2 to 2.5 hours. The goal of the session will be to identify common factual and legal issues across the Hunters Point related cases, and begin to identify discovery priorities in order to queue up an orderly settlement process. The following attorneys shall attend. If an attorney believes he or she cannot attend, by 11/18/2020 the attorney shall file a statement seeking to be excused from attendance and explaining the reason for non-attendance.Khaldoun Baghdadi and Sara PetersAnne Marie Murphy and Donald MagilliganMichael Pyle and Rob ChandlerJeffrey Dintzer and Matt WickershamDavid Marroso and Janniece GilliamsMichele Greif and Adam BainDavina Pujari and Mert HowardThe session will be held in Judge Ryu's non-public Zoom meeting room: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361The non-public Zoom Meeting link is also available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/17/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 17, 2020 Filing 33 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants. Filed by Mark Shea, Charlie Lyons, Richard Corriea, Victor Arrebollo, Marianne Galeano, Samuel Christ, James Hall, Sandra Fewer, David Maron, Gerald Lyons, Wayne Smith, Alicia Pashby, Robert Leung, Patrick Kwan, Mike Burkley, Leslie Forrestal, Francis Graves, Steven Zukor, Juliana Jamison, Yan Li, Keith Lai, Robert Armanino, Sean O'Leary, Aura Horton, Eugene Yoshii, Victoria Dockery, Malcolm Anderson, Sherry Hicks, Helen Jimenez, Dewayne Wilson, Keith Sanford, William Griffin, Juliana Garcia, Brian Delahunty, Niccole Rissetto, Libia Busalacchi, Carolyn Cunningham, Croce Casciato, Philip Brown, Deborah Mcalister, Bridget Lyons, Robert Bonnet, Carla Hurley, Ricardo Valdez, Robert Swall, Michelle Craig, Debbie Fung, Edward Yu, Henry Shishmanian, Jimmy Miranda, Christopher Olocco, Robert Payne, Thomas Haymond, Ayumi Otome, Jame Jones, Robin Laval, Darlene Martel, Alexis Goldner, Daniel Shiu, Neil Cunningham, Ann Lai, Steve Roche, Brian D'Arcy, Melvin Bautista, Michael Favetti, Mark Potter, Mary Ellen Hofmann, Gary Constantine, Kay Stenn, Stephen Mroz, Richard Jones, Raquel Williams, Anna Dowke, Al Van Buskirk, John Ramirez, Lamar Toney, Shirley Sanford, Arnaldo Aleman, Vincent Cantillon, Eddieberto Martinez, Gregory Latus, Jay Dowke, Peter Kozel, Brien Hoo, Mel Cardenas, Francesca MacKenzie, Mark Lundin, Mayra Guerrero, Eugene Kalinin, Lawrence Manwiller, Ronald Banta, William Ahern, Tarliena Balinton, Robert Ford, Mona Young Jew, Don Ciardella, Sylvie Tolosa, John Feeney, Clorinda Springer, Roland Tolosa, Ann Potter, Charles Lofgren, Ineke Rush Madsen, Carlos Recinos, Jesse Serna, Robert Bohanan, Yulanda Williams, Judith Solis, Kenneth Koenig, Juanita Stockwell, Bernadyn Woo Fong, Alan Levy, James Petty, Michelle Liddicoet, Robert Del Torre, Beverly Chan, Jonathan Fong, Linda Miller, Michael Rodriguez, Barrett Chan, Mark Madsen, Roberta Friedman, Kelvin Lai, Willa Brown, Annette Van Buskirk, Matthew Valmonte, Lawrence Gray, James Bosch, Sylvia Morrow, Evelyn Lee, Teresa Barrett, Jody Kato, Nancy Lopez Haggett, Keith Singer, Mario Molina, Judith Riggle, Kevin Abbey, Richmond Curry, Kevin Chin, Dean Taylor, Brian Danker, Annette Carrier, Christopher Hayes, Elizabeth Espinda, Michael Cleary, Carol Finney Mayer, Roberta Cunningham, Tracy McCray, Joseph Robles, Barbara Falk, Jean Buckley, Joy Geraty, Craig Farrell, Sharlene Hom, Joseph Zamagni, Jr., Patricia Priest, Eugene Galeano, Gary Aicardo, E.R. Balinton, Suzette Lee, Angela Wilhelm, Alan McCann, Samantha Mason, Alexa Suslow, Corazon Lai, John Geraty, Rolando Canales, Michael Becker, James O'Shea, Cherie Sakurai, Dean Marcic, Deborah DeFilippo, Alan Honniball, John Peterson, Edward Ellestad, Peter Richardson, James Lewis, Michael Pera, Dennis Meixner, Beaulah Connolly, Dan Laval, Debra Anderson, James Dudley, Taryn Aguilera, Darcy Lee Armanino, Nathan Chan, Stephen Kirwan, Jerome DeFilippo, Ed Wynkoop, Kelvin Sanders, Joshua Kumli, Michael Browne, Jennifer Williams, Stephen Jonas, Darby Reid, Mark Solomon, Kevin Ison, Liam Frost, Julie Yee, Robert Toy, Brendan O'Connor, Brett Bodisco, Roderick Young, Alejandro Tiffer, Pierre Martinez, Joe McCloskey, Stephen Tacchini, Carol Margetts, Susan Johnston, Kevin O'Malley, Susan Fernyak, Carl Bryant, Walter Chan, Daniel Rosiak, Stephen Tittel, Lewis Fong, Jacqueline Lyons, Bret Grennell, Maritza Casciato, Timothy Foley, Kevin Brugaletta, Shawn Wallace, John Garrity, Beverly Ann Hall, James Kelly, Kristin Coupar, Dannell Gallegos, Julie Centurioni, Katharine Cook, Jesse Robles, Kim Lewis, Edna Hoo, Kimberly Brazill, Gail Swall, Stephen Hampton, Daniel Hampton, Jan Daniele, Douglas Farmer, Teresa Daniele, Ana Morales, May Lee, Kelvin Woo, John Ehrlich, Wade Bailey, Lynn Schmidt, Richard Alves, James Guerrero, Thomas Horan, Katherine Honniball, Jerry Salvador, Joseph Carlin, Brent Bradford, Thomas Walsh, Melvin Thornton, Giuseppe Festa, Damon Williams, Catherine Smally, Larry Chan, Patrick Paton, Jill Legg, David Kamita, Denis O'Leary, Scott Korte, Victor Tsang, Angelo Spagnoli, Michael Griffin, Richard Daniele, Chris Galligan, Herman Jones, Roger Battaglia, Sharon Ford, Sherrill Quartini-Huddleston, Kathleen Knopp-Garcia, Wendy Bear, Carl Tennenbaum, John Higgins, Michael Slade, Mark McDonough, Sean McEllistrim, Alma Landi, Ly Duong, James Ramsey, Frederick Smally, Diane O'Leary, Thomas Wong, Alisha Williams, Roy Heavey, Laura Dito, Rosalind Reid, Roger Peters, Glenn Mori, Kristi Woo, Michael Jamison, David Smith, Patricia D'Arcy, Keith Lipp, Maria Bozin, Michael Huddleston, Edmund Cota, Kevin Kellogg, Larryett Anderson, Benny Fong, Steve Glickman, Michael Hamilton, Peter Kent De Jesus, Sean Cronin, John Denny, Patricia Linehan, Stephen Benzinger, Katherine Schwarz-Choy, Glenn Ortega, Sonia Mariona, Tami Celaya, Patricia Burley, Kimberly Sopp, John Newman, John Van Koll, Takako Swendsen, Karen McDonough, Peter Busalacchi, Louis Cassanego, Carolyn Lundin, Penny Schardt, Mary Frost, Damon Keeve, Roger Lu, Richard Van Koll, Glenn Sylvester, Alicia Kellogg, Donald Bickel, Teresa Ciardella, Andrew Kofman, Matt Mason, Trenia Wearing, Scott Dumont, Bassey Obot, Wendell Jones, Michael Robinson, Martha Fabiani, Estela Martinez Cuevas, Bart Johnson, Melinda Kalinin, Joseph Garbayo, Mimi Wong Haymond, Edgar Callejas, Edward St. Andre, Robert Totah, Mary Hamilton, Noreen Hughes, Teresa Rubie, Robert Chapman, Reno Rapagnani, Mary Needham, David Brandt, Stephen Murphy, Brian Boyd, Sylvia Solomon, Kenwade Lee, Robert Fung, Gerald Newbeck, John Mambretti, Michele Denomie, Alexandra Medina, John Miller, Jessie Ortiz, Vivi Garcia, James Gaan, Pamela Fitzgerald-Wermes, Lindsey Suslow, Rosemarie Smith, Heinz Hofmann, Brian Perry, Marilyn Bisordi, Joseph Allegro, Angelita Alves, Kim D'Arcy, Melissa Benzinger, Adriano Castro, George Cuevas, Sharon Ferrigno, Bryan Woo, Ryan Jensen, Kevin Dempsey, Pamela Hofsass, Karen Yee, David Dockery, Gerald Schmidt, Michael Niland, Dennis Schardt, Michael Keane, Michelle Walsh, Nida Sylvester, David Batchelder, Dan Linehan, Jose Macias, Matt Krimsky, Richard Lee, Anthony Fotinos, Mark Mahoney, Pamela Manwiller, Robert Duffield, Gordon Yee, Yvonne Hampton, Barbara Brewster, Michael Toomey, Winfred Jew, Bonnie Cheng, Jahan Kim, Franklin Lee, Matthew Castagnola, Anna Teresa Allen, Alex Lozano, Ben Mcalister, Steven Redd, Gabriela Keane, Christalyn Washington, Stanley Buscovich, Quentin Yaranon, Anthony Montoya, John Evans, Wallace Gin, Jesusima Yaranon, Johnny Velasquez, John Syme, Oscar Carcelen, Marcella Mastro, Rick Bailon, Marcie Mori, Jerrell Bell, Anthony Crosley, Cezar Perez, Dana Jonas, Steven Murphy, Kirk Bozin, Byron Fong, John Nevin, Daniel Greely, Nicholas Allen, Alexandra Ramirez, David Southern, Thomas Buckley, Mathew Pashby, Warren Yee, Leroy Lindo, Tahnee Mehmet, Theresa Rosiak, Timothy Tang, Pablo Ossio, Dori DelCarlo, John Goldberg, Maureen Hallinan, Mike Hara, Jared Monroe, Davin Cole, Robert Daniele, Marty Way, Gregory Dito, Joseph Barretta, Valerie Abbey, John Fewer, Margie Noli, Linda Zamagni, Carla Mendoza, Christian Newbeck, Liza Sung, Thomas Cunnane, Cynthia Cleary, Kimberly Wong, Lynette Syme, Clifford Cook, John Barcojo, David Kucia, Nicholas Sepich, Linda Delahunty, Philip Pera, Kurtis Wong, Lawrence Kempinski, Joseph Fong, Lamont Suslow, Dan Sui, Brian Canedo, Jody Rodriguez, Leanna Dawydiak, Lillian Velasquez, Scott Hurley, Iraj Mahvi, Marina Cunningham, Gary Jimenez, John Centurioni, Thomas King, Jose Robles, Herman Diggs, John Haverkamp, Kevin Needham, Lance Bosshard, Arthur Gabac, Lovely Robinson, Jessica Hampton, Bernadette Castagnola, Kevin Murray, Alexandria Brunner-Jones, Martin Lalor, Neil Swendsen, Brandon Thompson, Mary Burns, Sid Sakurai, Elizabeth Cronin, Rob Ziegler, Moses Gala, Donna Meixner, Lorraine Fong, Chris Dunne, Danny Lopez, Maria Corriea, George Fogarty, Dyanna Lee-Louie, Mark Williams, Keith Parker, Chris daRoza, Dino Zografos, Alan Hom, Robert Guillermo, Allyn Luenow, Joseph Reilly, Diane Saunders-Sui, Richard Ernst, Thomas Smith, Jr., Marlita Pera, Nicole Greely, Jared Lovrin, Denise Christ, Jordan Hom, Alberto Miranda, William Coggan, Dennis Martel, Robert Johnston, Tim Mayer, Michele Primiano, Michael Rebollini, David Oberhoffer, Edmund Garcia, Bruce Ferrigno, Erik Whitney, Mike Palada, Michael Globe, Adam Choy, Marquita Booth, William Brunicardi, Richard Parry, Tom Faye, Tim Oberzeir, Felix Sung, Joel Harms, Michael Zurcher, Anthony Calasanz, Elizabeth-Monica Salazar, Paul Swiatko, Erlyn Mambretti, Sallie Gin, Michael Hughes, Jason Sawyer, Gregory Neal, Edgar Springer, John Mino, Roy Priest, Brian Nannery, John Haggett, Andrea Joseph, Kelly Wesley, Dan Cunningham, Sonia Cole, Dustin Daza, Michael Connolly, Nicole Lama, Henry Garcia, Angee Cordero, Louis Espinda, Geoff Bowker, Larry Bertrand, Manuel Robleto, Tom Lee, Albert Tong, Nelson Lum, Matt MacKenzie, Annelyn Ison, Richard Tong, Dan Dudley, Joo-Han Kim, Chris Damonte, Tim Anderson, Joann Cunnane, Holly Pera, Roberto Salinas, Frances Williams, Brian Devlin, James Cunningham, Kathryn Brown, John Bisordi, Sonny Sarkissian, Kevin Whalen, Steven Landi, Daniel Manning, Matthew Mattei, Cory Blaiss Evans, Carol Slade, Carolyn St. Andre, Concepcion Bertrand, Julie Petty, Anthony Gomes, William Kraus, Katherine Portoni, Edith Lewis-Luenow, Eric Quema, Mari Shepard, Dominic Celaya, A.J. Holder, Julian Ng, Linda Wallace, Adriene Roche, Timothy Flaherty, Kathleen Hallin, Gerald D'Arcy, Evelyn Bell, Gerald Louie, Leslie Chin, Julie Dun, Lisa Frazer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Peters, Sara) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement conference planning session held on 11/9/2020 via Zoom. Results: By 12/18/2020, Defendants shall each submit a detailed confidential memo to Judge Ryu setting forth the requested insurance information. Please email the memos to Judge Ryu at DMRsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov.FTR Time: Not RecordedFor Abbey Plaintiffs: Khaldoun Baghdadi and Sara PetersFor Relator Plaintiffs: David AntonFor Pennington Plaintiffs: Anne Marie Murphy and Donald MagilliganFor Bayview Resident Plaintiffs: Cabral BonnerFor United States of America as Plaintiff: Michael Pyle and Rob ChandlerFor Five Point Parties: Jeffrey Dintzer and Matt WickershamFor Lennar Corporation Parties: David Marroso and Janniece GilliamsFor United States of America as Defendant: Michele Greif and Adam BainFor Tetra Tech Defendants: Davina Pujari and Mert HowardFor Defendant IO Environmental: Santino Tropea For Defendant Bill Dougherty: Richard SteingardFor CH2M Hill Case Defendants: Blanca YoungFor Defendant RSRM: Nicole HealyFor Shaw Defendants: Nick Danella and Kim Martin (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2020)
October 29, 2020 Set Hearing: Settlement Planning Conference set for 11/9/2020 10:00 AM. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 31 Judge Ryu will convene a one-hour settlement planning session on 11/9/20 at 10:00 via Zoom. In order to make the session more manageable, no more than two lawyers may attend per party. By no later than 11/5/20, each party must identify the name(s) of its representative(s) via email to DMRsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov. The session will be held in Judge Ryus non-public Zoom meeting room:https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09Meeting ID: 161 949 4731Passcode: 030361 Participants will initially enter a waiting room. In order to facilitate admission into the Zoom session, the participant should make sure that his/her name in the Zoom application matches the name provided to Judge Ryu. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 2, 2020 Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for settlement purposes. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/2/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 29 Case Reassigned to Judge James Donato. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 28 ORDER RELATING CASE TO C-19-7510-JD. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/29/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 27 Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purposes of Determining Relationship of Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/18/2020. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: May Lee, Annette Van Buskirk, Lillian Velasquez, Linda Wallace, Michelle Walsh, Anthony Crosley, Alisha Williams, Raquel Williams, Ayumi Otome, Kristi Woo, Jesusima Yaranon, Karen Yee, Concepcion Bertrand, Kathleen Hallin, Elizabeth Cronin, Victoria Dockery, Sandra Fewer, Bernadyn Woo Fong, Edna Hoo, Francesca MacKenzie, Patricia Priest, Theresa Rosiak, Michele Primiano, Catherine Smally, Carla Mendoza, Sylvie Tolosa, Katherine Schwarz-Choy, Sonia Cole, Suzette Lee, Alexandra Ramirez, Melissa Benzinger, Katherine Portoni, Linda Zamagni, Alicia Pashby, Nicole Lama, Kimberly Sopp and Dannell Gallegos. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Ineke Rush Madsen, Erlyn Mambretti, Pamela Manwiller, Barbara Falk, Kristin Coupar, Darlene Martel, Samantha Mason, Carol Finney Mayer, Deborah Mcalister, Karen McDonough, Dennis Meixner, Linda Miller, Marcie Mori, Mary Needham, Christian Newbeck, Jennifer Williams, Diane O'Leary, Alicia Pashby, Michael Pera, Marlita Pera, Julie Petty, Ann Potter, Lovely Robinson, Adriene Roche, Jody Rodriguez, Cherie Sakurai, Shirley Sanford, Penny Schardt, Lynn Schmidt, Carol Slade, Kay Stenn, Sylvia Solomon, Clorinda Springer, Carolyn St. Andre, Diane Saunders-Sui, Liza Sung, Alexa Suslow, Gail Swall, Takako Swendsen, Nida Sylvester and Lynette Syme. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Teresa Rubie, Vivi Garcia, Kathleen Knopp-Garcia, Joy Geraty, Sallie Gin, Mayra Guerrero, Nancy Lopez Haggett, Beverly Ann Hall, Mary Hamilton, Yvonne Hampton, Jessica Hampton, Mimi Wong Haymond, Mary Ellen Hofmann, Sharlene Hom, Katherine Honniball, Sherrill Quartini-Huddleston, Noreen Hughes, Carla Hurley, Annelyn Ison, Juliana Jamison, Mona Young Jew, Helen Jimenez, Susan Johnston, Dana Jonas, Melinda Kalinin, Gabriela Keane, Alicia Kellogg, Elizabeth-Monica Salazar, Corazon Lai, Ann Lai, Alma Landi, Robin Laval, Evelyn Lee, Dyanna Lee-Louie, Edith Lewis-Luenow, Ly Duong, Carolyn Lundin, Bridget Lyons and Jacqueline Lyons. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Valerie Abbey, Anna Teresa Allen, Angelita Alves, Darcy Lee Armanino, Tarliena Balinton, Marcella Mastro, Michele Denomie, Evelyn Bell, Marilyn Bisordi, Maureen Hallinan, Kimberly Brazill, Maria Bozin, Roberta Friedman, Jean Buckley, Libia Busalacchi, Maritza Casciato, Dori DelCarlo, Bernadette Castagnola, Alexandra Medina, Tami Celaya, Julie Centurioni, Beverly Chan, Yan Li, Leslie Chin, Denise Christ, Teresa Ciardella, Cynthia Cleary, Beaulah Connolly, Maria Corriea, Estela Martinez Cuevas, Joann Cunnane, Marina Cunningham, Roberta Cunningham, Carolyn Cunningham, Teresa Daniele, Jan Daniele, Patricia D'Arcy, Reno Rapagnani, Deborah DeFilippo, Linda Delahunty, Laura Dito, Anna Dowke, Susan Fernyak, Jill Legg, Angee Cordero, David Southern, Elizabeth Espinda, Cory Blaiss Evans, Bruce Ferrigno, Lorraine Fong, Sharon Ford, Mary Frost and Debbie Fung. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Ricardo Valdez, Matthew Valmonte, Al Van Buskirk, John Van Koll, Richard Van Koll, Johnny Velasquez, Shawn Wallace, Thomas Walsh, Christalyn Washington, Marty Way, Trenia Wearing, Kelly Wesley, Kevin Whalen, Erik Whitney, Angela Wilhelm, Damon Williams, Frances Williams, Mark Williams, Yulanda Williams, Dewayne Wilson, Kimberly Wong, Kurtis Wong, Thomas Wong, Bryan Woo, Kelvin Woo, Ed Wynkoop, Quentin Yaranon, Gordon Yee, Julie Yee, Warren Yee, Eugene Yoshii, Roderick Young, Edward Yu, Joseph Zamagni, Jr., Rob Ziegler, Dino Zografos, Steven Zukor and Michael Zurcher. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Sid Sakurai, Roberto Salinas, Jerry Salvador, Kelvin Sanders, Keith Sanford, Sonny Sarkissian, Jason Sawyer, Dennis Schardt, Gerald Schmidt, Nicholas Sepich, Jesse Serna, Mark Shea, Mari Shepard, Henry Shishmanian, Daniel Shiu, Keith Singer, Michael Slade, Frederick Smally, David Smith, Rosemarie Smith, Wayne Smith, Thomas Smith, Jr., Judith Solis, Mark Solomon, Angelo Spagnoli, Edgar Springer, Edward St. Andre, Juanita Stockwell, Dan Sui, Felix Sung, Lamont Suslow, Lindsey Suslow, Robert Swall, Neil Swendsen, Paul Swiatko, Glenn Sylvester, John Syme, Stephen Tacchini, Timothy Tang, Dean Taylor, Carl Tennenbaum, Brandon Thompson, Melvin Thornton, Alejandro Tiffer, Roland Tolosa, Lamar Toney, Albert Tong, Richard Tong, Michael Toomey, Robert Totah, Robert Toy, Victor Tsang and Stephen Tittel. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Mike Palada, Keith Parker, Richard Parry, Mathew Pashby, Patrick Paton, Robert Payne, Holly Pera, Philip Pera, Cezar Perez, Brian Perry, Roger Peters, John Peterson, James Petty, Mark Potter, Roy Priest, Michele Primiano, Eric Quema, John Ramirez, James Ramsey, Michael Rebollini, Carlos Recinos, Steven Redd, Darby Reid, Rosalind Reid, Joseph Reilly, Peter Richardson, Judith Riggle, Niccole Rissetto, Michael Robinson, Michael Robison, Joseph Robles, Jesse Robles, Jose Robles, Manuel Robleto, Steve Roche, Michael Rodriguez and Daniel Rosiak. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Jose Macias, Matt MacKenzie, Mark Madsen, Mark Mahoney, Iraj Mahvi, John Mambretti, Daniel Manning, Lawrence Manwiller, Dean Marcic, Carol Margetts, Sonia Mariona, David Maron, Dennis Martel, Pierre Martinez, Eddieberto Martinez, Matt Mason, Matthew Mattei, Tim Mayer, Ben Mcalister, Alan McCann, Joe McCloskey, Tracy McCray, Mark McDonough, Sean McEllistrim, Tahnee Mehmet, Donna Meixner, John Miller, John Mino, Alberto Miranda, Jimmy Miranda, Mario Molina, Jared Monroe, Anthony Montoya, Ana Morales, Glenn Mori, Sylvia Morrow, Stephen Mroz, Stephen Murphy, Steven Murphy, Kevin Murray, Brian Nannery, Gregory Neal, Kevin Needham, John Nevin, Gerald Newbeck, John Newman, Julian Ng, Michael Niland, Margie Noli, James O'Shea, David Oberhoffer, Tim Oberzeir, Bassey Obot, Brendan O'Connor, Denis O'Leary, Sean O'Leary, Christopher Olocco, Kevin O'Malley, Glenn Ortega, Jessie Ortiz and Pablo Ossio. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Eugene Kalinin, David Kamita, Jody Kato, Michael Keane, Damon Keeve, Kevin Kellogg, James Kelly, Lawrence Kempinski, Jahan Kim, Joo-Han Kim, Thomas King, Stephen Kirwan, Kenneth Koenig, Andrew Kofman, Scott Korte, Peter Kozel, William Kraus, Matt Krimsky, David Kucia, Joshua Kumli, Patrick Kwan, Keith Lai, Kelvin Lai, Martin Lalor, Steven Landi, Gregory Latus, Dan Laval, Franklin Lee, Kenwade Lee, Richard Lee, Tom Lee, Robert Leung, Alan Levy, James Lewis, Kim Lewis, Michelle Liddicoet, Leroy Lindo, Dan Linehan, Patricia Linehan, Keith Lipp, Charles Lofgren, Danny Lopez, Gerald Louie, Jared Lovrin, Alex Lozano, Roger Lu, Allyn Luenow, Nelson Lum, Mark Lundin, Charlie Lyons and Gerald Lyons. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: John Haggett, James Hall, Michael Hamilton, Daniel Hampton, Mike Hara, Joel Harms, John Haverkamp, Christopher Hayes, Thomas Haymond, Roy Heavey, Sherry Hicks, John Higgins, Heinz Hofmann, Pamela Hofsass, A.J. Holder, Alan Hom, Jordan Hom, Alan Honniball, Brien Hoo, Thomas Horan, Aura Horton, Michael Huddleston, Michael Hughes, Scott Hurley, Carla Hurley, Kevin Ison, Michael Jamison, Ryan Jensen, Winfred Jew, Gary Jimenez, Bart Johnson, Robert Johnston, Stephen Jonas, Herman Jones, Jame Jones, Richard Jones, Wendell Jones, Andrea Joseph and Stephen Hampton. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: James Gaan, Arthur Gabac, Moses Gala, Eugene Galeano, Marianne Galeano, Chris Galligan, Joseph Garbayo, Edmund Garcia, Henry Garcia, Juliana Garcia, John Garrity, John Geraty, Wallace Gin, Steve Glickman, Michael Globe, John Goldberg, Alexis Goldner, Anthony Gomes, Francis Graves, Lawrence Gray, Daniel Greely, Nicole Greely, Bret Grennell, Michael Griffin, William Griffin, James Guerrero and Robert Guillermo. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: John Ehrlich, Edward Ellestad, Richard Ernst, Louis Espinda, John Evans, Martha Fabiani, Douglas Farmer, Craig Farrell, Michael Favetti, Tom Faye, John Feeney, Sharon Ferrigno, Giuseppe Festa, John Fewer, Pamela Fitzgerald-Wermes, Timothy Flaherty, George Fogarty, Timothy Foley, Byron Fong, Jonathan Fong, Joseph Fong, Lewis Fong, Benny Fong, Robert Ford, Leslie Forrestal, Anthony Fotinos, Lisa Frazer, Liam Frost and Robert Fung. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Kim D'Arcy, Chris Damonte, Richard Daniele, Robert Daniele, Brian Danker, Brian D'Arcy, Gerald D'Arcy, Chris daRoza, Leanna Dawydiak, Dustin Daza, Peter Kent De Jesus, Jerome DeFilippo, Robert Del Torre, Brian Delahunty, Kevin Dempsey, John Denny, Brian Devlin, Herman Diggs, Gregory Dito, David Dockery, Jay Dowke, James Dudley, Robert Duffield, Scott Dumont, Julie Dun, Chris Dunne and Dan Dudley. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Robert Chapman, Bonnie Cheng, Kevin Chin, Adam Choy, Samuel Christ, Don Ciardella, Michael Cleary, William Coggan, Davin Cole, Michael Connolly, Gary Constantine, Clifford Cook, Katharine Cook, Richard Corriea, Edmund Cota, Michelle Craig, Sean Cronin, George Cuevas, Thomas Cunnane, Dan Cunningham, James Cunningham, Neil Cunningham and Richmond Curry. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Peter Busalacchi, Stanley Buscovich, Anthony Calasanz, Edgar Callejas, Rolando Canales, Brian Canedo, Vincent Cantillon, Oscar Carcelen, Mel Cardenas, Joseph Carlin, Annette Carrier, Croce Casciato, Louis Cassanego, Matthew Castagnola, Adriano Castro, Dominic Celaya, John Centurioni, Barrett Chan, Larry Chan, Nathan Chan and Walter Chan. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Brent Bradford, David Brandt, Barbara Brewster, Kathryn Brown, Philip Brown, Willa Brown, Michael Browne, Kevin Brugaletta, William Brunicardi, Alexandria Brunner-Jones, Carl Bryant, Thomas Buckley, Mike Burkley, Patricia Burley and Mary Burns. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: John Bisordi, Brett Bodisco, Robert Bohanan, Robert Bonnet, Marquita Booth, James Bosch, Lance Bosshard, Geoff Bowker, Brian Boyd and Kirk Bozin. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Rick Bailon, E.R. Balinton, Ronald Banta, John Barcojo, Teresa Barrett, Joseph Barretta, David Batchelder, Roger Battaglia, Melvin Bautista, Wendy Bear, Michael Becker, Jerrell Bell, Stephen Benzinger, Larry Bertrand and Donald Bickel. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America, Department of the Navy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Taryn Aguilera, William Ahern, Gary Aicardo, Arnaldo Aleman, Joseph Allegro, Nicholas Allen, Richard Alves, Debra Anderson, Larryett Anderson, Malcolm Anderson, Tim Anderson, Robert Armanino, Victor Arrebollo and Wade Bailey. (This is a text-only entry.) (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kevin Abbey re #1 Complaint FOR DAMAGES (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Kevin Abbey . (Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES [Negligence; Negligent Misrepresentation; Negligence Per Se; Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress; Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress; Loss of Consortium; Wrongful Death; Amount in Controversy Exceeds $25,000]; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against United States of America, Department of the Navy filed by Kevin Abbey, (Filing Fee Paid of $400,00, Receipt #0971-14938636) Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C)(Peters, Sara) (Filed on 9/14/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbey v. United States of America, Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Abbey
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Lewis
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Lyons
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.J. Holder
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Anderson
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rebollini
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Maron
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Choy
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beaulah Connolly
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt MacKenzie
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrett Chan
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Young
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcy Lee Armanino
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Gabac
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Carrier
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oberhoffer
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winfred Jew
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McDonough
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Wallace
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Lundin
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Cunnane
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Greely
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Diggs
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hamilton
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Hara
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Krimsky
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Griffin
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Calasanz
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Sopp
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heinz Hofmann
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris daRoza
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Miranda
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Captain Teresa Barrett
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Buckley
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Louie
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Haggett
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concepcion Bertrand
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Badge #1651 Joseph Barretta
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Taylor
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward St. Andre
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Martel
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Sylvester
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Haverkamp
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Chan
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Yaranon
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Syme
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brunicardi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Sepich
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Fong
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Callejas
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Fogarty
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarliena Balinton
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Jonas
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Bautista
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jamison
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fung
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa Suslow
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Fernyak
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Brown
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Valdez
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Del Torre
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Lyons
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesca MacKenzie
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Solomon
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Mendoza
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy McCray
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hamilton
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Lai
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Cunningham
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Newman
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Murphy
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Mariona
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Rubie
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Tacchini
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Thornton
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dudley
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Hofsass
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lee
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Castagnola
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Lyons
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Latus
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bohanan
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Olocco
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Recinos
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Chan
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Manwiller
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Toney
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Browne
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth-Monica Salazar
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Chapman
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnston
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Kempinski
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Tolosa
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Feeney
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Young Jew
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Monroe
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Devlin
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Friedman
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe McCloskey
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Dudley
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Bryant
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Alves
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Macias
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Honniball
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Hurley
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Yee
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Suslow
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Martel
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Tennenbaum
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annelyn Ison
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Miller
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Zamagni, Jr.
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Geraty
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Geraty
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Burkley
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Robles
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Keeve
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tahnee Mehmet
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Stockwell
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian D'Arcy
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Singer
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharine Cook
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Lai
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Sung
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Goldberg
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Fong
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Castagnola
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Petty
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Dunne
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Solis
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Tang
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah DeFilippo
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Banta
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Cook
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Horan
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Hicks
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Southern
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Jones
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Daniele
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Officer Vincent Cantillon
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Whalen
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Frazer
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Corriea
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Van Koll
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund Cota
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Cunningham
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Saunders-Sui
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Palada
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Daniele
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Yee
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia D'Arcy
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Espinda
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sallie Gin
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Busalacchi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Forrestal
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Dito
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Leung
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Laval
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dori DelCarlo
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lopez Haggett
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliana Jamison
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willa Brown
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Carlin
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Smally
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Mcalister
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Lozano
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Pashby
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clorinda Springer
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Fong
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Mori
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Slade
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Swall
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Represented By: Jade Smith-Williams
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Wendi Jill Berkowitz
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Kelly L. Ganci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times |