Grillo v. Monsanto Company et. al.
Plaintiff: Angelo Grillo
Defendant: Monsanto Company and JOHN DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2020cv06501
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2741, Eastern District of New York, 2:20-cv-02712 GRB AKT, Grillo v. Monsanto Company et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-06501 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 233 cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02712. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 14, 2020 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 233) IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2741. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (Florio, Lisa)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 233) IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2741. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER. Initial Conference set for November 6, 2020 at 10 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. The Initial Conference will be conducted by telephone. Counsel are directed to utilize the Court's teleconferencing line at (866) 590-5055, access code 9720458, at the time of the conference. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the Court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/10/2020. (Wolf, Deanna)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelo Grillo. Monsanto Company served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Roddy, Kevin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (Tirado, Chelsea)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Angelo Grillo (Roddy, Kevin)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-50, Monsanto Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12946558 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Angelo Grillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Roddy, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grillo v. Monsanto Company et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Grillo
Represented By: Kevin P. Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?