Reaves v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Reaves
Defendant: John Doe and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv06503
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED re 3:16-md-02741-VC: USDC, Western District of Arkansas (El Dorado Division), 1:20-cv-01044-SOH, Elizabeth Reaves v. Monsanto Company, et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-06503-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-233) cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas (El Dorado Division); Case Number 1:20-cv-01044-SOH. Original File, Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received.
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Conditional Transfer Order transferring case to District of North District of CA (MDL 2741). Signed by Unassigned on September 14, 2020. (cnn)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Elizabeth Reaves. Monsanto Company served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Ludwig, Kyle) Modified on 9/2/2020 to correct service and answer date (cnn).
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Monsanto Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. (Ludwig, Kyle)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Demand for Jury Trial against John Doe, Monsanto Company, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number AARWDC-2206964), filed by Elizabeth Reaves. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Exhibit A, #(2) Affidavit Affidavit as to Unknown Tortfeasors)(Ludwig, Kyle)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Elizabeth Reaves. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Reaves
Represented By: Kyle Phillip Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?