Tejera v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Ramon Tejera
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv06507
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Southern District of Florida, 9:20-cv-81358-RKA Tejera v. Monsanto Company, opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-6507-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 233 cc: JPMDL (gbaS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:20-cv-81358. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 14, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per DE #4 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-233) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 2741 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (cds)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-13383304, payment transferred from : 0:20-cv-61686, filed by Ramon Tejera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Conze, Kertch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tejera v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Tejera
Represented By: Kertch J. Conze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?