Asetek Danmark A/S v. Corsair Gaming, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Asetek Danmark A/S
Defendant: Corsair Components, Inc., Corsair Gaming, Inc. and Corsair Memory, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv06541
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 10:30 AM by Videoconference Only. Hearing set alongside related case. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2020. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov /emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2020. Initial Cas e Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 10:30 AM by Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint, #5 Certificate of Intersted Entities, #7 Order, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #15 Order and Standing Orders. by Asetek Danmark A/S (McCauley, Robert) (Filed on 10/26/2020) Modified on 10/26/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #18 Certificate of Service, filed by Asete k Danmark A/S. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case related to 19-cv-410-EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2020 02:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/6/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/5/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Asetek Danmark A/S.. (McCauley, Robert) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Defendant Corsair Memory, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Defendant Corsair Components, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendant Corsair Gaming, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #(1) Complaint for Patent Infringement)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020) Modified on 9/18/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Asetek Danmark A/S identifying Corporate Parent Asetek Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Asetek A/S, Other Affiliate Arbejdsmarkedets Tillaegspension for Asetek Danmark A/S. (McCauley, Robert) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (McCauley, Robert) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (McCauley, Robert) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (McCauley, Robert) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Corsair Components, Inc., Corsair Gaming, Inc., Corsair Memory, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14956027). Filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C, #(4) Exhibit D, #(5) Civil Cover Sheet)(McCauley, Robert) (Filed on 9/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asetek Danmark A/S v. Corsair Gaming, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsair Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsair Gaming, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsair Memory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asetek Danmark A/S
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Represented By: Arpita Bhattacharyya
Represented By: Jeffrey D Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?