Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer v. ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc.
Plaintiff: Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A, U.S. Bank N.A. and ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv06698
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part #48 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held by Zoom videoconference on 1/11/2021 re #48 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. The Court heard arguments and will issue a written order. (Court Reporter: Marla Knox)(Time 00:19)Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 1:30 p.m. by videoconference. Joint case management statement shall be filed by 2/18/2021.Attorneys for Plaintiff: Daniel Cohen, Jeremy Friedman & Jonathan DeSantisAttorneys for Defendants: Christopher Comstock and Chris Kelly (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2021) Modified on 1/11/2021 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2021 Due to technical difficulties on January 7, 2021, Defendant's #48 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) is continued to 1/11/2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan DeSantis. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Cohen. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15401766.) filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (DeSantis, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15396538.) filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Cohen, Daniel) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identifie d by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on 1/6/2021.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entr y.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 14, 2020 Filing 54 REPLY (re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Memorandum in support filed byATC Realty Fifteen, Inc.. (Comstock, Christopher) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Daniel R. Miller in Opposition to #51 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byEstate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #51 ) (Miller, Daniel) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Roland J. Hoefer in Opposition to #51 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byEstate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #51 ) (Miller, Daniel) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 51 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Estate's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byEstate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Miller, Daniel) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the initial case management conference set for December 24, 2020 is hereby vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 49 Declaration of Reginald T. Dawson in Support of #48 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byATC Realty Fifteen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #48 ) (Comstock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 11/9/2020. Replies due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Comstock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Miller. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15069032.) filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Miller, Daniel) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 45 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer.. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Kelly, Christopher) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #41 Stipulation Regarding Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss and Setting Briefing Schedule for New Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Comstock. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss and Setting Briefing Schedule for New Motion to Dismiss filed by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc.. (Kelly, Christopher) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 40 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc... (Comstock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Corporate Parent Wells Fargo and Company for ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc.. (Comstock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy L. Friedman (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Kelly (Kelly, Christopher) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999037.) filed by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Comstock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/9/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:20-cv-00312. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 24, 2020 Filing 34 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/24/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #32 Stipulation and Order for Transfer of Claims Against Defendant ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. to Northern District of California filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/24/2020. (fms)
September 24, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California. (fms)
September 23, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION and (proposed) Order for Transfer of Claims Against Defendant ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. to Northern District of California by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Miller, Daniel)
September 23, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Claims against Wells Fargo, N.A. by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Miller, Daniel)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to September 28, 2020 and October 12, 2020 filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer, Set Briefing Schedule: re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon lacks personal jurisdiction and fails to state a claim for relief MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person . (Answering Brief due 9/28/2020., Reply Brief due 10/12/2020.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/11/2020. (nmf)
September 10, 2020 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to September 28, 2020 and October 12, 2020 - filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Miller, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to September 14, 2020 and September 28, 2020 - filed by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Caponi, Steven)
August 12, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Miller on behalf of Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer (Miller, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to September 14, 2020 and September 28, 2020 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. Set Briefing Schedule: re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon lacks personal jurisdiction and fails to state a claim for relief MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person . (Answering Brief due 9/14/2020., Reply Brief due 9/28/2020.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/12/2020. (fms)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERING BRIEF AND DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT to AUGUST 14, 2020 and AUGUST 28, 2020 filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. Set Briefing Schedule: re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon lacks personal jurisdiction and fails to state a claim for relief MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person . (Answering Brief due 8/14/2020., Reply Brief due 8/28/2020.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/3/2020. (fms)
August 1, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERING BRIEF AND DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT to AUGUST 14, 2020 and AUGUST 28, 2020 - filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Gouge, Donald)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Stipulation to extend time for plaintiff's answering brief and defendant's reply brief on the defendant's motion to dismiss the first amended complaint to July 31, 2020 and August 14, 2020 respectively to filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer, Set Briefing Schedule: (Answering Brief due 7/31/2020., Reply Brief due 8/14/2020.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/10/2020. (fms)
July 9, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Stipulation to extend time for plaintiff's answering brief and defendant's reply brief on the defendant's motion to dismiss the first amended complaint to July 31, 2020 and August 14, 2020 respectively to - filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Gouge, Donald) Modified on 7/10/2020 (fms).
June 26, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION re #24 Opening Brief in Support, of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Caponi, Steven)
June 26, 2020 Filing 24 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon lacks personal jurisdiction and fails to state a claim for relief MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2020. (Caponi, Steven)
June 26, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon lacks personal jurisdiction and fails to state a claim for relief, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person - filed by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer First Amended Complaint to June 26, 2020 - filed by ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer First Amended Complaint to June 26, 2020 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. answer due 6/26/2020; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 6/26/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/11/2020. (fms)
April 27, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer First Amended Complaint to June 12, 2020 - filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Gouge, Donald)
April 27, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Goeller on behalf of ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. (Goeller, Matthew)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer First Amended Complaint to June 12, 2020 filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. answer due 6/12/2020; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 6/12/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/27/2020. (fms)
April 14, 2020 Remark: The summons form attached to the Amended Complaint at D.I. #19 has been removed from the docket and will not be issued. Counsel is advised to look at the court's website: www.ded.uscourts.gov, under CURRENT NEWS AND ANNOUNCEMENTS, click 'view all' and find the summons form under 3/23/2020. New Electronic Summons Form - AO 440. In an effort to reduce the handling of paper copies, The District Court has created an Electronic Civil Summons form (AO 440) for Counsel to complete and use without requiring the Clerk to print, sign, seal and handle the originals. Any questions please call the Clerk's office at 302-573-6170. (fms)
April 14, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of D.I. #19 has been corrected to add ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. as a defendant. Counsel should have added the party through the filing of the Amended Complaint. The party has now been added by the docket clerk. (fms)
April 14, 2020 Remark: The corrected summons form at D.I. #20 has been removed from the docket. Counsel just has to complete and use without requiring the Clerk to print, sign, and seal. (fms)
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc. - filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Gouge, Donald) Modified on 4/14/2020 (fms).
April 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher S. Comstock for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher S. Comstock - filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Caponi, Steven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Christine Tucker in Support of the Motion to Dismiss by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A., as Securities Intermediary by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seaman, John)
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Immediate Discovery from Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer re #8 Supplemental MOTION for Discovery Immediate (Gouge, Donald)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher S. Comstock filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/2/2020. (fms)
April 1, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Harry S. Davis and Bayard P. Brown for U.S. Bank, N.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Harry S. Davis and Bayard P. Brown of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP filed by U.S. Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/1/2020. (fms)
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss /Declaration of Christopher J. Nuxoll in Support of the Motion to Dismiss by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A., as Securities Intermediary by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seaman, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss /Declaration of Andrea Serra in Support of the Motion to Dismiss by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A., as Securities Intermediary by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seaman, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing 13 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss /Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A., as Securities Intermediary filed by U.S. Bank, N.A..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification)(Seaman, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seaman, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Harry S. Davis and Bayard P. Brown of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP - filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Harry S. Davis of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP, #2 Certification of Bayard P. Brown of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Seaman, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, N.A. filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Seaman, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Kevin G. Abrams, Esq. and John M. Seaman, Esq. of Abrams & Bayliss LLP on behalf of defendant U.S. Bank, N.A., as Securities Intermediary by U.S. Bank, N.A. (Seaman, John)
March 27, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, Exhibit A to D.I. #8 has been removed and replaced. (fms)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 Supplemental MOTION for Discovery Immediate - filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Gouge, Donald) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/27/2020) (fms).
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to April 27, 2020 - filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Caponi, Steven)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to April 27, 2020 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 4/27/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/26/2020. (nmf)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/12/2020. (nmf)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on U.S. Bank, N.A. on March 10, 2020, filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Gouge, Donald)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Immediate Discovery - filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gouge, Donald)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Rodney Samuels for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on March 9, 2020, filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Gouge, Donald)
March 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against U.S. Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2867913) - filed by Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/3/2020) (amf).
March 2, 2020 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to U.S. Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 3/2/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer v. ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Represented By: Christopher S. Comstock
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Harry S. Davis
Represented By: Bayard P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC Realty Fifteen, Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Represented By: Matthew B. Goeller
Represented By: Christopher S. Comstock
Represented By: Christopher John Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Roland Glen Hoefer
Represented By: Donald L. Gouge, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Miller
Represented By: Daniel Miller
Represented By: Jeremy L. Friedman
Represented By: Jonathan Zachary DeSantis
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?