Robinson v. Saul
Plaintiff: George Robinson
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv06731
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Yang, Annabelle) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 6, 2020 SSA and USAO acknowledged electronic receipt of summons and waiver. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Summons and waiver emailed to SSA. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.The complaint having been found to comply with Title 28 USC 1915, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk issue summons, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, any amendments, scheduling orders, attachments, plaintiff's affidavit and this order upon the defendant.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by George Robinson. (Alegre, Caroline) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. #Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Complaint filed by George Robinson (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Fi led on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byGeorge Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alegre, Caroline) (Filed on 9/25/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Robinson
Represented By: Caroline Joy Alegre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Annabelle J. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?